Chapman v. City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC
Plaintiff: Ke'mon Chapman and Sheyla Pallet
Defendant: City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv02778
Filed: April 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent City Winery, LLC for City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC. Document filed by City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC..(Rutigliano, Paul)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC..(Rutigliano, Paul)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yosef Nussbaum on behalf of Ke'mon Chapman, Sheyla Pallet..(Nussbaum, Yosef)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 25, 2023. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 24, 2023, is adjourned to June21, 2023, at 4:00 P.M. At that time, the parties shall call 888-363-4749 and use the access code 558-3333. The deadline for the parties to file the joint letter and proposed civil case management plan and scheduling order is extended to June 14, 2023, at 12:00 P.M. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 10.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 6/21/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/20/2023) (ama)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC answer due 5/25/2023. (ama)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mohammad Adil Yaqoob on behalf of City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC..(Yaqoob, Mohammad)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Paul Rutigliano dated April 19, 2023. Document filed by City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC..(Rutigliano, Paul)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul J Rutigliano on behalf of City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC..(Rutigliano, Paul)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise Andrea Schulman on behalf of Ke'mon Chapman..(Schulman, Denise)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: May 17, 2023 at noon. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 5/24/2023 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/5/2023) (jca)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC..(jgo)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Sheyla Pallet..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Digiulio on behalf of Ke'mon Chapman..(Digiulio, Michael)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ke'mon Chapman..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27556107)Document filed by Ke'mon Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ke'mon Chapman Consent to Sue).(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ke'mon Chapman
Represented By: Michael Digiulio
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Yosef Nussbaum
Represented By: Denise Andrea Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheyla Pallet
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Yosef Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Winery NY - Pier 57, LLC
Represented By: Paul J Rutigliano
Represented By: Mohammad Adil Yaqoob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?