United States of America v. Hendler et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Hanna Hendler, Danielle Benishai and Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2023cv03280
Filed: April 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 5321 Penalty; Reports of Currency and Foreign Transaction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Danielle Benishai, Does 1-100, Hanna Hendler..(Perry, Melissa)
June 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Ann Perry on behalf of Hanna Hendler..(Perry, Melissa)
June 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Ann Perry on behalf of Danielle Benishai..(Perry, Melissa)
May 18, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ready for Trial by 11/20/2023. (ate)
May 18, 2023 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is not to be tried to a jury. First request for production of documents, if any, must be served by 5/25. Interrogatories pursuant to Rule 33.3(a) of the Local Civil Rules of the Southern District of New York must be served by 5/25. A final pre-trial conference, as well as oral argument on any post-discovery summary judgment motions, shall be held on 11/28 at 11am. Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 7/28/2023. Responses due by 11/3/2023 Replies due by 11/17/2023. Deposition due by 10/6/2023. Discovery due by 10/6/2023. Oral Argument set for 11/28/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/18/2023) (ate)
May 18, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2023, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
May 11, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/11/2023, ( Initial Telephonic Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information remains the same.) (Kotowski, Linda)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/5/2023) (tg)
April 25, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hanna Hendler waiver sent on 4/21/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. Document filed by United States of America..(Levine, Danielle)
April 25, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Danielle Benishai waiver sent on 4/21/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. Document filed by United States of America..(Levine, Danielle)
April 21, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hanna Hendler..(lal)
April 21, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danielle Benishai..(lal)
April 20, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hanna Hendler, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America..(Levine, Danielle)
April 20, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Danielle Benishai, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America..(Levine, Danielle)
April 20, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levine, Danielle)
April 20, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levine, Danielle) Modified on 4/20/2023 (pc).
April 20, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 20, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 20, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Danielle Judith Levine to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
April 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Danielle Judith Levine. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $79,679,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $80,000;. (pc)
April 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Danielle Judith Levine to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not properly signed. Use a /s/ signature or a wet signature;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
April 19, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levine, Danielle) Modified on 4/20/2023 (pc).
April 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danielle Benishai, Does 1-100, Hanna Hendler. Document filed by United States of America..(Levine, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hendler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Danielle Judith Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna Hendler
Represented By: Melissa Ann Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Benishai
Represented By: Melissa Ann Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?