Duartez et al v. 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Duartez and Juan Lozano Vera
Defendant: 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC and Suffolk Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03447
Filed: April 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Louis Paone on behalf of 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC, Suffolk Construction Company, Inc...(Paone, Nicholas)
June 21, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of JUAN LOZANO VERA on 08/24/2023 at 10:00am.Document filed by 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC, Suffolk Construction Company, Inc...(Fabiani, John)
June 21, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of CARLOS DUARTEZ on 08/23/2023 at 10:00am.Document filed by 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC, Suffolk Construction Company, Inc...(Fabiani, John)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on July 21, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. and as set forth herein. Counsel for Plaintiffs is ordered to notify Defendants of this Notice. SO ORDERED.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 7/21/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/21/2023) (ama)
June 21, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC, Suffolk Construction Company, Inc...(Fabiani, John)
June 8, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC served on 5/17/2023, answer due 6/7/2023. Service was accepted by Robert Guyette, Officer. Document filed by Carlos Duartez; Juan Lozano Vera..(Bernstein, Jason)
June 2, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Suffolk Construction Company, Inc. served on 5/17/2023, answer due 6/7/2023. Service was accepted by Ingrid Lopez, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Carlos Duartez; Juan Lozano Vera..(Bernstein, Jason)
May 10, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suffolk Construction Company, Inc...(jgo)
May 10, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC..(jgo)
May 9, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suffolk Construction Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carlos Duartez, Juan Lozano Vera..(Bernstein, Jason)
May 9, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carlos Duartez, Juan Lozano Vera..(Bernstein, Jason)
May 4, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason M. Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF case caption contains a typographical error; party name on the docket entry text must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 3, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suffolk Construction, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carlos Duartez, Juan Lozano Vera..(Bernstein, Jason) Modified on 5/4/2023 (jgo).
May 3, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 520 Fee Owner 2, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carlos Duartez, Juan Lozano Vera..(Bernstein, Jason) Modified on 5/4/2023 (jgo).
April 26, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 26, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 26, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason M. Bernstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $5,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
April 26, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bernstein, Jason)
April 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Duartez, Juan Lozano Vera. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27652788)Document filed by Carlos Duartez, Juan Lozano Vera..(Bernstein, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duartez et al v. 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Duartez
Represented By: Jason M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lozano Vera
Represented By: Jason M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 520 Fee Owner 2 LLC
Represented By: John Vincent Fabiani, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Louis Paone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Vincent Fabiani, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Louis Paone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?