Z Payments Solution Corp. v. FISERV, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Z Payments Solution Corp.
Defendant: FISERV, Inc. and First Data Merchant Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03702
Filed: May 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its amended Complaint by July 14, 2023. Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended Complaint by July 26, 2023. Also by July 26, 2023, the parties shall refile their joint letter and proposed case management plan to reflect any changes stemming from the amended Complaint. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 19, 2023, is adjourned to August 2, 2023, at 4:20 P.M. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/30/2023) (tro)
June 30, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2023.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (tro)
June 29, 2023 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Amended Complaint. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael K. Chong, Esq. dated 6/29/23. Document filed by Z Payments Solution Corp...(Chong, Michael)
June 22, 2023 Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Letter, filed by Z Payments Solution Corp. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file its amended Complaint by June 30, 2023. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended Complaint by July 12, 2023. By July 12, 2023, the parties shall also refile their joint letter and proposed case management plant to reflect any changes stemming from the amended complaint. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 28, 2023, is adjourned to July 19, 2023, at 4:20 P.M. FISERV, Inc. answer due 7/12/2023; First Data Merchant Services LLC answer due 7/12/2023. ( Initial Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2023) (ate)
June 21, 2023 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time in Light of Forthcoming Amendment addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John W. Peterson dated June 21, 2023. Document filed by FISERV, Inc., First Data Merchant Services LLC..(Peterson, John)
June 21, 2023 Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael K. Chong, Esq. dated 6/21/23 re: Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Z Payments Solution Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Plan).(Chong, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to June 28, 2023, at 4:20 P.M. The parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan by June 21, 2023. Initial Conference set for 6/28/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/13/2023) (tg)
June 12, 2023 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John W. Peterson and Michael K. Chong dated 6/12/2023. Document filed by FISERV, Inc., First Data Merchant Services LLC..(Peterson, John)
May 31, 2023 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Z Payments Solution Corp...(Chong, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael K. Chong on behalf of Z Payments Solution Corp...(Chong, Michael)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by June 9, 2023, counsel for Plaintiff shall appear, or Plaintiff shall file a letter describing its efforts to retain counsel promptly in this matter. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/30/2023) (vfr)
May 22, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court's Order (ECF No. 9) served on Kai Yin Liu on 05/22/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by FISERV, Inc., First Data Merchant Services LLC..(Peterson, John)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John W. Peterson dated May 18, 2023. Application GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by June 22, 2023. By May 26, 2023, counsel for Plaintiff shall appear, or Plaintiff shall file a letter describing its efforts to promptly retain counsel in this matter. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/19/2023) (jca)
May 19, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: FISERV, Inc. answer due 6/22/2023; First Data Merchant Services LLC answer due 6/22/2023. (jca)
May 18, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John W. Peterson dated May 18, 2023. Document filed by FISERV, Inc., First Data Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Motion - Attorney Withdrawal).(Peterson, John)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John W. Peterson dated 05/04/2023.. Application GRANTED. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by May 23, 2023.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/5/2023) FISERV, Inc. answer due 5/23/2023; First Data Merchant Services LLC answer due 5/23/2023 (ks)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/21/2023 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/5/2023) (vfr)
May 5, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 5/23/2023. (ks)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John W. Peterson dated 05/04/2023. Document filed by FISERV, Inc., First Data Merchant Services LLC..(Peterson, John)
May 3, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Peterson, John)
May 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney John Wellington Peterson. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
May 3, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 3, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 3, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 2, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent First Data Corporation for First Data Merchant Services LLC. Document filed by First Data Merchant Services LLC..(Peterson, John)
May 2, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FISERV, Inc...(Peterson, John)
May 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 651678/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27689172).Document filed by FISERV, Inc., First Data Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summonses and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of B. Maravent).(Peterson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Z Payments Solution Corp. v. FISERV, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z Payments Solution Corp.
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISERV, Inc.
Represented By: John Wellington Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Merchant Services LLC
Represented By: John Wellington Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?