Doe v. Brisam Clinton LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Brisam Clinton LLC d/b/a Comfort Inn, MK LCP Rye LLC D/B/A Hilton, BRE/PRIME MEZZ LLC D/B/A LA QUINTA INN & SUITES, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Choice Hotels International, Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Management LLC, Brisam Clinton LLC doing business as Comfort Inn, MK LCP Rye LLC doing business as Hilton, BRE/Prime Mezz LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn and Suites, CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C formerly known as BRE/Prime MEZZ LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn and Suites, Cavalier MergerSub LP, BRE, CorePoint Lodging, Inc., La Quinta Franchising LLC, LQ Management L.L.C., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites, Choice Hotels International Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn and Hilton Management LLC d/b/a Hilton
Case Number: 1:2023cv04032
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #122 MOTION for Allison L. McQueen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28439588. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
October 17, 2023 Filing 122 MOTION for Allison L. McQueen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28439588. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allison L. McQueen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, Illinois, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison L. McQueen).(McQueen, Allison)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: As correction to the text in the case management plan order entered at Dkt. No. 88, the Status Conference is scheduled for October 17, 2024 at 2:00PM. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
October 4, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/17/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/22/23) (yv)
September 21, 2023 Filing 120 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Bryan O. Blevins, Jr. dated September 21, 2023 re: Proposed Protective Order. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order).(Blevins, Bryan)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: Accordingly, on or before September 22, 2023, the parties shall either (a) submit a revised protective order eliminating the language in Paragraph 12 that Plaintiff keep her identity confidential or (b) in the alternative, provide authority for the relevant language in Paragraph 12 that establishes that the Court can enter such an order with respect to Plaintiff's disclosures. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/19/2023) (tg)
September 18, 2023 Filing 118 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Bryan O. Blevins, Jr. dated September18, 2023 re: Proposed Protective Order. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order).(Blevins, Bryan)
September 15, 2023 Filing 117 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/7/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 15, 2023 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 9/7/2023 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Franko, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal #109 Motion for Protective Order. The Court heard oral argument today on Plaintiff's motion for a protective order. See Dkt. No. 109. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion for a protective order is denied without prejudice to renewal by submission of a revised form of protective order consistent with this Order on or before September 18, 2023. This order memorializes and explains the Court's rulings stated during oral argument. Finally, the Court agrees that Defendants have sufficiently justified the designation of two categories of confidential documents, including a category identified as "attorneys' eyes only," but believes that the category as currently defined in Defendants' proposed protective order is overly vague and broad. The parties are directed to refine the language accordingly. The Court also directs the parties' attention to a recent article by Eugene Volokh in Judicature, which highlights some of the non-substantive issues related to advancing a case under a pseudonym. See Eugene Volokh, If Pseudonyms, Then What Kind?, 107 Judicature 77 (2022-23). The parties are directed to discuss whether a different pseudonym should be used in this case going forward to militate against these issues. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 109. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/8/23) (yv)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court will hold a Telephone Conference in this matter to address the discovery dispute tomorrow, September 7, 2023 at 3:00PM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
September 6, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
September 1, 2023 Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion re: #109 FIRST MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Proposed Protective Order).(Turner, Sara)
August 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Letter Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
August 19, 2023 Filing 112 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Nicole M. Perry dated August 19, 2023. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC..(Perry, Nicole)
August 18, 2023 Filing 111 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #99 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc...(Turner, Sara)
August 18, 2023 Filing 110 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #96 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C, Cavalier MergerSub LP, LQ Management L.L.C., La Quinta Franchising LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites..(Sager, David)
August 18, 2023 Filing 109 FIRST MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Memorandum of Law in Support of Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order).(Walsh, Janet)
August 18, 2023 Filing 108 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #94 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Hilton Management LLC..(Perry, Nicole)
August 14, 2023 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony P. Mastroianni on behalf of Jane Doe..(Mastroianni, Anthony)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #105 Letter filed by Jane Doe. ENDORSEMENT: The request for an Extension of time until August 18, 2023 for Plaintiff to file a motion for a protective order is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 8/18/2023.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/11/2023) (mml)
August 11, 2023 Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Janet Walsh dated August 11, 2023 re: Protective Order. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Proposed Protective Order).(Walsh, Janet)
August 11, 2023 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #96 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
August 11, 2023 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #94 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
August 11, 2023 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #99 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
July 28, 2023 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #99 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc...(Turner, Sara)
July 28, 2023 Filing 100 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc...(Turner, Sara)
July 28, 2023 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. Responses due by 8/11/2023.(Turner, Sara)
July 28, 2023 Filing 98 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. for LQ Management L.L.C., La Quinta Franchising LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites; Corporate Parent Cavalier MergerSub LP for CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C. Document filed by CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C, Cavalier MergerSub LP, LQ Management L.L.C., La Quinta Franchising LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites..(Sager, David)
July 28, 2023 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #96 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C, Cavalier MergerSub LP, LQ Management L.L.C., La Quinta Franchising LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites..(Sager, David)
July 28, 2023 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Document filed by CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C, Cavalier MergerSub LP, LQ Management L.L.C., La Quinta Franchising LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites. Responses due by 8/11/2023.(Sager, David)
July 28, 2023 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #94 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Hilton Management LLC..(Perry, Nicole)
July 28, 2023 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC. Responses due by 8/11/2023.(Perry, Nicole)
July 21, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #93 FIRST MOTION for Francesca A. Iacovangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of New York; the filing fee was not paid. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (va)
July 20, 2023 Filing 93 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Francesca A. Iacovangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Francesca Iacovangelo in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B - Proposed Order for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Iacovangelo, Francesca) Modified on 7/21/2023 (va).
July 18, 2023 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. La Quinta Franchising LLC served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. Service was accepted by Marcie Wyatt, Registered Agent Assistant. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
July 18, 2023 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Cavalier MergerSub LP served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. Service was accepted by Teresa Granderson, Managing Agent. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
July 18, 2023 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. LQ Management L.L.C. served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. Service was accepted by Curt Sweltz, Managing Agent. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
July 18, 2023 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C served on 7/17/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. Service was accepted by Dave "Doe", Authorized Party/Managing Agent. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c).The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Motions due by 8/11/2023. Depositions shall be completed by 3/11/24. Deposition due by 9/23/2024. Fact Discovery due by 4/8/2023. Expert Discovery due by 9/23/2024. Discovery due by 9/23/2024. Status Conference set for 10/17/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is fifteen days. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/18/23) (yv)
July 18, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Janet Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #87 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #86 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #85 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 17, 2023 Filing 87 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/18/2023 (jgo).
July 17, 2023 Filing 86 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Choice Hotels International Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/18/2023 (jgo).
July 17, 2023 Filing 85 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Hilton Management LLC d/b/a Hilton, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/18/2023 (jgo).
July 13, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/13/2023 by Telephone Conference. Bryan Blevins, Christopher Kirchmer, Fabiana Baum, and Janet Walsh present by telephone for Plaintiff. David Sager, Nathan Heller, and Christine LiCalzi present by telephone for La Quinta Defendants. Sara Turner present by telephone for Defendant, Choice Hotels International, Inc. Nicole Perry and Allison McQueen present by telephone for Defendant, Hilton Management LLC. Court reporter present by telephone. Case management plan approved. Within one week after agreement on a protective order or a decision from the Court, parties are to submit to the Court a revised case management plan, if any deadlines need to be adjusted. Plaintiff to move for a protective order by August 11, 2023. Defendants' opposition due by August 25, 2023. Plaintiff's reply due by September 1, 2023. With respect to the schedule for motions to dismiss, the deadline for Defendants' to file their motion to dismiss is July 28, 2023. Parties may meet and confer and agree on a briefing schedule, otherwise the default rules will apply of Plaintiff's opposition to be due by August 11, 2023 and Defendants' reply by August 18, 2023. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for October 17, 2024 at 2:00PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
July 13, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Marie Perry on behalf of Hilton Management LLC..(Perry, Nicole)
July 13, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bethany K. Biesenthal on behalf of Hilton Management LLC..(Biesenthal, Bethany)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Nathan P. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (st) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
July 11, 2023 Filing 81 MOTION for Nathan P. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27985509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C, Cavalier MergerSub LP, LQ Management L.L.C., La Quinta Franchising LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nathan P. Heller, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing from PA and NJ, #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order).(Heller, Nathan)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Bryan O. Blevins, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
July 11, 2023 Filing 78 MOTION for Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Document No. 65). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Admission, #2 Exhibit COGS; Texas, #3 Exhibit COGS; Colorado, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order).(McAdams, Annie)
July 11, 2023 Filing 77 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to MK LCP Rye LLC..(jgo)
July 11, 2023 Filing 76 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brisam Clinton LLC..(jgo)
July 11, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan O. Blevins, Jr on behalf of Jane Doe..(Blevins, Bryan)
July 11, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Thomas Kirchmer on behalf of Jane Doe..(Kirchmer, Christopher)
July 11, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Janet Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #73 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #70 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #69 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: Due to an ongoing trial before the Court, the Initial Pretrial Conference previously set for July 12, 2023 is RESCHEDULED to July 13, 2023 at 5:30PM. Parties are reminded to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
July 11, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 05:30 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
July 11, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #81 MOTION for Nathan P. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27985509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 11, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #78 MOTION for Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Document No. 65). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 11, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #68 FIRST MOTION for Francesca A. Iacovangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (dsh)
July 10, 2023 Filing 73 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/11/2023 (jgo).
July 10, 2023 Filing 72 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Brisam Clinton LLC d/b/a Comfort Inn, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
July 10, 2023 Filing 71 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to MK LCP Rye LLC d/b/a Hilton, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
July 10, 2023 Filing 70 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Choice Hotels International Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/11/2023 (jgo).
July 10, 2023 Filing 69 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Hilton Management LLC d/b/a Hilton, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/11/2023 (jgo).
July 10, 2023 Filing 68 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Francesca A. Iacovangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Francesca Iacovangelo In Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - NY Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - PA Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - FL Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission of Pro Hac Vice).(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/11/2023 (dsh).
July 10, 2023 Filing 67 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Francesca A. Iacovangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27978960. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Francesca Iacovangelo In Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order For Admission for Pro Hac Vice).(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/10/2023 (sgz).
July 10, 2023 Filing 66 MOTION for Bryan O. Blevins, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27978277. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. Return Date set for 7/11/2023 at 04:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Admission, #2 Exhibit COGS, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Blevins, Bryan)
July 10, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #65 MOTION for Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27973712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Colorado;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (dsh)
July 10, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Janet Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #60 Request for Issuance of Summons, #61 Request for Issuance of Summons, #63 Request for Issuance of Summons, #64 Request for Issuance of Summons, #62 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 10, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #67 FIRST MOTION for Francesca A. Iacovangelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27978960. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida 850-488-0125. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
July 10, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #66 MOTION for Bryan O. Blevins, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27978277. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 7, 2023 Filing 65 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27973712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice on Written Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing; Texas, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing; Colorado).(McAdams, Annie) Modified on 7/10/2023 (dsh).
July 7, 2023 Filing 64 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Choice Hotels International Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/10/2023 (pc).
July 7, 2023 Filing 63 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hilton Management LLC d/b/a Hilton, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/10/2023 (pc).
July 7, 2023 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/10/2023 (pc).
July 7, 2023 Filing 61 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brisam Clinton LLC d/b/a Comfort Inn, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/10/2023 (pc).
July 7, 2023 Filing 60 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MK LCP Rye LLC d/b/a Hilton, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 7/10/2023 (pc).
July 5, 2023 Filing 59 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order).(Baum, Fabiana)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Bethany K. Biesenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (st) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Nicole M. Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (st) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 28, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites, Choice Hotels International Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn, Hilton Management LLC d/b/a Hilton added. Party added pursuant to #43 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Jane Doe. Related document: #43 Amended Complaint,..(Walsh, Janet)
June 28, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Bethany K. Biesenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27929768. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
June 28, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #54 MOTION for Nicole M. Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27930493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
June 27, 2023 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sara M. Turner dated June 27, 2023 re: Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s intention to move to dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12.. Document filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc...(Turner, Sara)
June 27, 2023 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Taylor Goodspeed dated June 27, 2023 re: Hilton Management LLC's intention to move to dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC..(Goodspeed, Taylor)
June 27, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION for Nicole M. Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27930493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicole M. Perry in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission of Nicole M. PerryPro Hac Vice).(Perry, Nicole)
June 27, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION for Bethany K. Biesenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27929768. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bethany K. Biesenthal in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission of Bethany K. Biesenthal Pro Hac Vice).(Biesenthal, Bethany)
June 27, 2023 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cavalier MergerSub LP..(pc)
June 27, 2023 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C..(pc)
June 27, 2023 Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to La Quinta Franchising LLC..(pc)
June 27, 2023 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LQ Management L.L.C...(pc)
June 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Janet Walsh re: Document No. #43 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Choice Hotels International, Inc. and Hilton Management LLC to CM ECF with their respective DBAs as alias for each party. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
June 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Janet Walsh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C. f/k/a BRE/Prime MEZZ LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn and Suites, Cavalier MergerSub LP f/k/a CorePoint Lodging, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
June 26, 2023 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from David S. Sager, Esq. dated June 26, 2023 re: intention to move to dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Document filed by BRE/Prime Mezz LLC, CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C. f/k/a BRE/Prime MEZZ LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn and Suites, Cavalier MergerSub LP f/k/a CorePoint Lodging, Inc., LQ Management L.L.C., La Quinta Franchising LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC..(Sager, David)
June 26, 2023 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LQ Management L.L.C., re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 26, 2023 Filing 46 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to La Quinta Franchising, LLC, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 26, 2023 Filing 45 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C. f/k/a BRE/Prime MEZZ LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn and Suites, re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 26, 2023 Filing 44 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cavalier MergerSub LP f/k/a CorePoint Lodging, Inc., re: #43 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 26, 2023 Filing 43 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint, against Brisam Clinton LLC, Choice Hotels International, Inc., Hilton Management LLC, La Quinta Holdings Inc., MK LCP Rye LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC, CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C. f/k/a BRE/Prime MEZZ LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn and Suites, Cavalier MergerSub LP f/k/a CorePoint Lodging, Inc., La Quinta Franchising LLC, LQ Management L.L.C. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jane Doe. Related document: #6 Complaint,..(Walsh, Janet)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Sara Marie Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (st) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 21, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION for Sara Marie Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27902288. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sara Turner in Support og Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Alabama, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Minnesota, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Turner, Sara)
June 21, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Sara Marie Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27902288. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Christopher T. Kirchmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (st) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 15, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Christopher T. Kirchmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27874388. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
June 14, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION for Christopher T. Kirchmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27874388. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Baum, Fabiana)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Fabiana Mauricio Baum to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (st) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 9, 2023 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. Service was accepted by Curt Sweltz, Managing Agent. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 9, 2023 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Hilton Resorts Corporation served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. Service was accepted by Minard Carkner, Service of Process. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 9, 2023 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Hilton Management LLC served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. Service was accepted by Minard Carkner, Service of Process. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 9, 2023 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Choice Hotels International, Inc. served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. Service was accepted by Minard Carkner, Service of Process. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 9, 2023 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. La Quinta Holdings Inc. served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. Service was accepted by Curt Sweltz, Managing Agent. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
June 9, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Fabiana Mauricio Baum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-27854191. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of good standing supporting Motion, #2 Exhibit Certification of good standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Baum, Fabiana)
June 9, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Fabiana Mauricio Baum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-27854191. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
June 8, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Anne Casey on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc...(Casey, Jennifer)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on July 12, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to the conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendants/all counsel of this Notice. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 7/12/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/8/23) (yv)
June 7, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David S. Sager on behalf of La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC..(Sager, David)
June 7, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Anne Reinckens on behalf of La Quinta Holdings Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC..(Reinckens, Melissa)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Taylor Goodspeed dated June 7, 2023.. All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
June 7, 2023 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. for Hilton Management LLC. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC..(Goodspeed, Taylor)
June 7, 2023 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Taylor Goodspeed dated June 7, 2023. Document filed by Hilton Management LLC..(Goodspeed, Taylor)
June 7, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taylor Allison Goodspeed on behalf of Hilton Management LLC..(Goodspeed, Taylor)
May 17, 2023 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC..(pc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hilton Management LLC..(pc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Choice Hotels International, Inc...(pc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to La Quinta Holdings Inc...(pc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRE/Prime Mezz LLC..(pc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hilton Resorts Corporation..(pc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brisam Clinton LLC..(pc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MK LCP Rye LLC..(pc)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM & ORDER. The Court will permit the filing of the complaint and the issuance of summonses to Defendants. Plaintiff represents that plaintiff "will provide K.S.'s full name and identifying information to Defendants, through their counsel, subject to an appropriate protective order." Dkt. No. 5 at 6. The litigation involves matters that are highly sensitive and of a personal nature as further set forth in this Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to issue the summonses requested by Plaintiff at Dkt. Nos. 7-14. The Court reserves decision on the motion at Dkt. No. 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/17/23) (yv) Transmission to Civil Case Openings Clerk for processing.
May 16, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MK LCP Rye LLC d/b/a Hilton, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brisam Clinton LLC d/b/a Comfort Inn, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRE/Prime Mezz LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to La Quinta Holdings Inc., re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Choice Hotels International, Inc., re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hilton Resorts Corporation, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hilton Management LLC, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against BRE/Prime Mezz LLC, Brisam Clinton LLC, Choice Hotels International, Inc., Hilton Management LLC, Hilton Resorts Corporation, La Quinta Holdings Inc., MK LCP Rye LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Janet Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
May 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Janet Walsh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
May 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Janet Walsh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BRE/PRIME MEZZ LLC D/B/A LA QUINTA INN & SUITES, Brisam Clinton LLC d/b/a Comfort Inn, MK LCP Rye LLC D/B/A Hilton. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
May 16, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Janet Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form; Each Summons request is filed as its own individual event. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 16, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 15, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION Proceed Under a Pseudonym re: #4 Notice (Other) . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Notice of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet)
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRISAM CLINTON LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN, MK LCP RYE LLC D/B/A HILTON, BRE/PRIME MEZZ LLC D/B/A LA QUINTA INN & SUITES, LA QUINTA HOLDINGS INC., CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC, HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION, HILTON MANAGEMENT LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 5/16/2023 (vf).
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walsh, Janet)
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against BRE/PRIME MEZZ LLC D/B/A LA QUINTA INN & SUITES, Brisam Clinton LLC d/b/a Comfort Inn, Choice Hotels International, Inc., Hilton Management LLC, Hilton Resorts Corporation, La Quinta Holdings Inc., MK LCP Rye LLC D/B/A Hilton, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27741379)Document filed by Jane Doe..(Walsh, Janet) Modified on 5/16/2023 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Brisam Clinton LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Janet Walsh
Represented By: Fabiana Baum
Represented By: Bryan O. Blevins, Jr
Represented By: Annie McAdams
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kirchmer
Represented By: Francesca Iacovangelo
Represented By: Anthony P. Mastroianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brisam Clinton LLC d/b/a Comfort Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MK LCP Rye LLC D/B/A Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE/PRIME MEZZ LLC D/B/A LA QUINTA INN & SUITES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Holdings Inc.
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Melissa Anne Reinckens
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Casey
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Melissa Anne Reinckens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC
Represented By: Taylor Allison Goodspeed
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Nicole Marie Perry
Represented By: Allison Leigh McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brisam Clinton LLC doing business as Comfort Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MK LCP Rye LLC doing business as Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE/Prime Mezz LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn and Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG Prime MEZZ L.L.C formerly known as BRE/Prime MEZZ LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn and Suites
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalier MergerSub LP
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CorePoint Lodging, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Franchising LLC
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management L.L.C.
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn & Suites
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC d/b/a Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?