Hussey v. Beth Israel Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Yessuh Suhyes Hussey
Defendant: Beth Israel Medical Center, NYPD Officer Jane Doe/John Doe, Hospital Physician Jane Doe/ John Doe and Ambulance Driver Jane Doe/ John Doe
Case Number: 1:2023cv04377
Filed: May 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 9. Mailed to: Yessuh Suhyes Hussey NYSID:15124253K B&C: 1412301710 10-10 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (ok)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiffs prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiffs obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiffs address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/11/2023) (sha)
June 26, 2023 Filing 8 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Yessuh Suhyes Hussey.(sc)
June 6, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 7. Mailed to: Yessuh Suhyes Hussey NYSID:15124253K B&C: 1412301710 10-10 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (kh)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 7/5/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/5/2023) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Prisoner authorization) (scn)
June 5, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:23-cv-02181. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
May 25, 2023 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions..(tro)
May 25, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (tro)
May 25, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Unassigned Judge. .(tro)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER: In the interest of justice, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer these 16 actions to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. 28 U.S.C. 112(b); 1406(a). The decisions on Plaintiff's applications to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 are reserved for the transferee Court. The Court offers no opinion on the merits of the actions. The provision of Local Rule 83.1 that requires a seven-day stay is hereby waived. Summonses shall not issue from this Court and the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and to mark these cases closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/27/2023. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-02154-PKC-LB et al. (FG) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
May 16, 2023 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of New York. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-02154-PKC-LB et al. (FG) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
April 26, 2023 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: Order Dismissing Case, docket entry #5 , filed on 4/18/2023 was filed under this action in error and has been removed. (ML) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
April 10, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Yessuh Suhyes Hussey. (TLH) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
March 23, 2023 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (TPL) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
March 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. Mailed out on 3/23/2023. (TPL) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 5/25/2023.]
February 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yessuh Suhyes Hussey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TPL) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 5/25/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussey v. Beth Israel Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yessuh Suhyes Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Israel Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Jane Doe/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Physician Jane Doe/ John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ambulance Driver Jane Doe/ John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?