HMM Co. Ltd. v. M/V One Apus et al
Plaintiff: HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd, Hmm Co. LTD. and Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd
Defendant: M/V ONE APUS, in rem, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD. and M/V ONE Apus
Case Number: 1:2023cv04572
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 mc Marine Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marlo J. Hittman on behalf of Shipco Transport, Shipco Transport Inc, Shipco Transport Inc., Shipco Transport Inc., Shipco Transport, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE et al..(Hittman, Marlo)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF TAG ALONG ACTION: re: (532 in 1:22-md-03028-PAE) Letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to designate the above-captioned cases as member cases in the multi-district litigation at docket No. 22 Md. 3028. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/05/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03028-PAE, 1:23-cv-01295-PAE, 1:23-cv-04572-PAE (ama)
June 5, 2023 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE.. (ama)
June 4, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
June 4, 2023 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE.. (laq)
June 4, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
June 4, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
June 1, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chidori Ship Holding LLC, Jessica Ship Holding S.A., M/V ONE Apus, NYK Shipmanagement PTE LTD...(pc)
June 1, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 22md3028. (pc)
June 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
June 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Garth S. Wolfson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank; County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2,200,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
June 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Garth S. Wolfson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, in rem, NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted; DO NOT TYPE ALL PARTY NAMES IN ALL CAPS. (pc)
May 31, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M/V ONE APUS, in rem, CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.., NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd..(Wolfson, Garth)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-md-3028. Document filed by HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd..(Wolfson, Garth)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wolfson, Garth)
May 31, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd..(Wolfson, Garth)
May 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC, JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A., M/V ONE APUS, in rem, NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27811837)Document filed by HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Wolfson, Garth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HMM Co. Ltd. v. M/V One Apus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMM Co. Ltd. f/k/a Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hmm Co. LTD.
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyundai Merchant Marine Co., Ltd
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ONE APUS, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIDORI SHIP HOLDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA SHIP HOLDING S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYK SHIPMANAGEMENT PTE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ONE Apus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?