Securities and Exchange Commission v. Coinbase, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission and Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: COINBASE, INC, COINBASE GLOBAL, INC. and Coinbase, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv04738
Filed: June 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Referring Judge: Jennifer H Rearden
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 37 DECLARATION of David P.T. Webb in Support re: #35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J).(Webb, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
August 4, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #33 Letter filed by Coinbase, Inc., Coinbase Global, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. The briefing schedule will proceed as follows: Defendants' opening brief is due on or before August 4, 2023, and shall not exceed 30 pages; Any amicus briefs in support of Defendants' motion are due on or before August 11, 2023, and shall not exceed 20 pages; Plaintiff's opposition brief is due on or before October 3, 2023, and shall not exceed 30 pages; Any amicus briefs in support of Plaintiff's opposition are due on or before October 10, 2023, and shall not exceed 20 pages; Defendants' reply brief is due on or before October 24, 2023, and shall not exceed 15 pages. Additionally, the Court is in receipt of the parties' proposed case management plan dated July 20, 2023. (Dkt. #32). It is the Court's practice to stay discovery during the pendency of a fully dispositive motion and, as such, will not enter the case management plan at this time. To the extent necessary, the Court will order the parties to file an amended proposed case management plan following its decision on the above motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket number 23. SO ORDERED., ( Brief due by 8/4/2023., Responses due by 10/3/2023, Replies due by 10/24/2023.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/20/2023) (ama)
July 20, 2023 Filing 33 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from W. Savitt and P. Mancuso dated July 20, 2023 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
July 20, 2023 Filing 32 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
July 20, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 7/13/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 20, 2023 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/13/2023 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2023..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Main Document 30 replaced on 7/26/2023) (js).
July 19, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sijin Choi on behalf of Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Choi, Sijin)
July 13, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial/Pre-motion Conference held on 7/13/2023. Attorneys Nicholas Margida, Peter Mancuso, Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart, and Ben Ninan Kuruvilla, representing Plaintiff present. Attorneys William D. Savitt and Steven Robert Peikin representing Defendants present. The parties shall meet and confer, and in one week, submit a proposed case management plan, and a letter stating the parties' respective positions on moving forward with their anticipated motions, and proposed briefing schedule, if moving forward with motions. (See transcript.) (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (tn)
July 12, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David P.T. Webb on behalf of Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Webb, David)
July 12, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE re: #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, . Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
July 7, 2023 Filing 26 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Nicholas Margida dated July 7, 2023 re: #23 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from William D. Savitt dated June 28, 2023. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Margida, Nicholas)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Pre-Motion Submission addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Nicholas Margida dated June 29, 2023.Application GRANTED. Additionally, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for August 24, 2023, is hereby converted to a pre-motion conference and is rescheduled to July 13, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ORDERED to appear at that time in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at et number 24. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/29/2023) (tg)
June 29, 2023 Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Pre-Motion Submission addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Nicholas Margida dated June 29, 2023. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Margida, Nicholas)
June 29, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (tg)
June 28, 2023 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from William D. Savitt dated June 28, 2023. Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
June 28, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
June 28, 2023 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc...(Savitt, William)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/24/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/22/2023) (tg)
June 14, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Jennifer H. Rearden is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Nicholas C. Margida to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
June 7, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Coinbase, Inc. waiver sent on 6/7/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. Document filed by Coinbase, Inc...(Peikin, Steven)
June 7, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Coinbase Global, Inc. waiver sent on 6/7/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. Document filed by Coinbase Global, Inc...(Peikin, Steven)
June 7, 2023 Filing 16 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 7, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; party name on the PDF case caption must match as it appears on the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 7, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 7, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission; COINBASE, INC; COINBASE GLOBAL, INC.,. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) Modified on 6/7/2023 (jgo).
June 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Nicholas C. Margida to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nicholas C. Margida, #2 Exhibit DC Bar Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit VA S. Ct. Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Margida, Nicholas)
June 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olivia Chalos on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(Chalos, Olivia)
June 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia A Malkina on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(Malkina, Julia)
June 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James McDonald on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(McDonald, James)
June 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Suzanne McArthur on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(McArthur, Kathleen)
June 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Robert Peikin on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(Peikin, Steven)
June 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Michael Gogolak on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(Gogolak, Adam)
June 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Kathleen Eddy on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(Eddy, Sarah)
June 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin S. Schwartz on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(Schwartz, Kevin)
June 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William D Savitt on behalf of COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC..(Savitt, William)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ben Ninan Kuruvilla on behalf of U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission..(Kuruvilla, Ben)
June 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Mancuso on behalf of U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission..(Mancuso, Peter)
June 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart on behalf of U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission..(Stewart, Ladan)
June 6, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tenreiro, Jorge) Modified on 6/7/2023 (jgo).
June 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COINBASE GLOBAL, INC., COINBASE, INC. Document filed by U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 6, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Nicholas C. Margida to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Coinbase, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Ben Ninan Kuruvilla
Represented By: Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart
Represented By: Nicholas Margida
Represented By: Peter Mancuso
Represented By: Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Ben Ninan Kuruvilla
Represented By: Nicholas Margida
Represented By: Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro
Represented By: Peter Mancuso
Represented By: Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COINBASE, INC
Represented By: Kevin S. Schwartz
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Eddy
Represented By: William D Savitt
Represented By: Adam Michael Gogolak
Represented By: James McDonald
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Olivia G. Chalos
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne McArthur
Represented By: Steven Robert Peikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COINBASE GLOBAL, INC.
Represented By: Kevin S. Schwartz
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Eddy
Represented By: Adam Michael Gogolak
Represented By: William D Savitt
Represented By: James McDonald
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne McArthur
Represented By: Olivia G. Chalos
Represented By: Steven Robert Peikin
Represented By: David P.T. Webb
Represented By: Sijin Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinbase, Inc.
Represented By: David P.T. Webb
Represented By: James McDonald
Represented By: Adam Michael Gogolak
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne McArthur
Represented By: Sijin Choi
Represented By: Steven Robert Peikin
Represented By: William D Savitt
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Olivia G. Chalos
Represented By: Kevin S. Schwartz
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?