Gayle v. Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Gayle
Defendant: Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc. and Justworks Employment Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv04987
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Justworks Employment Group LLC. Document filed by Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc...(Seo, Diana)
August 7, 2023 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc...(Seo, Diana)
August 2, 2023 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/1/2023.(sge)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case be referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court unless otherwise noted. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/14/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/31/2023) (ama)
July 30, 2023 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Plaintiff's Counsel Abdul K. Hassan, Esq. dated July 30, 2023 re: Request for Referral to Mediation Program. Document filed by Ryan Gayle..(Hassan, Abdul)
July 12, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court's July 10, 2023 Order served on Defednant Justworks Employment Group LLC on July 11, 2023 and July 12, 2023. Service was made by Mail & Email. Document filed by Ryan Gayle..(Hassan, Abdul)
July 11, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theresa Jeanine D'Andrea on behalf of Justworks Employment Group LLC..(D'Andrea, Theresa)
July 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Brian Lichtenberg on behalf of Justworks Employment Group LLC..(Lichtenberg, David)
July 11, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Justworks Employment Group LLC..(Lichtenberg, David)
July 11, 2023 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Justworks Employment Group LLC..(Lichtenberg, David)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #13 Letter filed by Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc. ENDORSEMENT: For the sake of consistency, both Defendants' answers willbe due on August 7, 2023. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant Justworks Employment Group LLC by July 12, 2023, andto file proof of service on the docket one day thereafter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/10/2023) (ama)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Robert Jun dated July 10, 2023 re: Mistaken granting of extension to unrepresented defendant. Document filed by Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc...(Jun, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Robert Jun dated July 10, 2023. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 11. SO ORDERED. Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc. answer due 8/7/2023; Justworks Employment Group LLC answer due 8/7/2023. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/10/2023) (ama)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Robert Jun dated July 10, 2023. Document filed by Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc., Justworks Employment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulation).(Jun, Robert)
July 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diana Y. Seo on behalf of Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc...(Seo, Diana)
July 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Jun on behalf of Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc...(Jun, Robert)
June 20, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc. served on 6/20/2023, answer due 7/11/2023; Justworks Employment Group LLC served on 6/20/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Ryan Gayle..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 16, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc., Justworks Employment Group LLC. (vf)
June 15, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc., and Justworks Employment Group LLC,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan Gayle..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Cave no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference, scheduled for September 14, 2023. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/15/2023) (ate)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Separate and apart from the foregoing, unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 14, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. Initial Conference set for 9/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/15/2023) (ate)
June 14, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 14, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 14, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Abdul Karim Hassan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF for the request for issuance of summons is not legible;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 13, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 13, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc., and Justworks Employment Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan Gayle..(Hassan, Abdul) Modified on 6/14/2023 (pc).
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc., Justworks Employment Group LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27869772)Document filed by Ryan Gayle..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gayle v. Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gayle
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Clean-Up Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Diana Y. Seo
Represented By: Robert Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justworks Employment Group LLC
Represented By: David Brian Lichtenberg
Represented By: Theresa Jeanine D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?