Navigators Management Company, Inc. et al v. Euro Cargo Express Inc.
Plaintiff: Navigators Management Company, Inc.
Defendant: Euro Cargo Express Inc. doing business as ECX Global Logistics
3Rd Party Defendant: Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd. and Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp.
Case Number: 1:2023cv05769
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jessica G L Clarke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., re: #23 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
September 1, 2023 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd., re: #23 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
September 1, 2023 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd., re: #23 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
September 1, 2023 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd., re: #23 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
September 1, 2023 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp., re: #23 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
September 1, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp., re: #23 Amended Third Party Complaint,. Document filed by Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp...(Dooley, Teresa)
September 1, 2023 Filing 23 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT amending #11 Third Party Complaint against Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp., Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd., Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd..Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc.. Related document: #11 Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint).(Dooley, Teresa)
August 7, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Euro Cargo Express Inc. waiver sent on 7/14/2023, answer due 9/12/2023. Document filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc.; Navigators Management Company, Inc.(on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company, Inc.)..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 26, 2023 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp.. (vf)
July 26, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd.. (vf)
July 26, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd.. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp., re: #11 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
July 25, 2023 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHINE INTL TRANSPORTATION LTD., re: #11 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
July 25, 2023 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHINE INTL TRANSPORTATION LTD., re: #11 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
July 24, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Teresa H Dooley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Euro Cargo Express Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (vf)
July 24, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Teresa H Dooley. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Euro Cargo Express Inc. with party role ThirdParty Plaintiff. The party was added to the case in error. (Duplicate Party) (vf)
July 24, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Teresa H Dooley to RE-FILE Document No. #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
July 21, 2023 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp., re: #11 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp...(Dooley, Teresa) Modified on 7/24/2023 (vf).
July 21, 2023 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd., re: #11 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd...(Dooley, Teresa) Modified on 7/24/2023 (vf).
July 21, 2023 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd., re: #11 Third Party Complaint. Document filed by Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd...(Dooley, Teresa) Modified on 7/24/2023 (vf).
July 21, 2023 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc...(Dooley, Teresa)
July 21, 2023 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd., Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp..Document filed by Euro Cargo Express Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint).(Dooley, Teresa)
July 20, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Kevin J.B. O'Malley dated July 20, 2023 re: to contact Your Honor's Chambers pursuant to the Order of Reference to a Magistrate Judge (Doc. 9). Document filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc., Navigators Management Company, Inc.(on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company, Inc.)..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Cott no later than July 20, 2023. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 7/18/2023) (ate)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment, except that any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before the Court is adjourned pending further order of the Court. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which a https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jessica-g-l-clarke. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 7/19/2023) (tg)
July 13, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Judge Loretta A. Preska is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 10, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
July 10, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-00331-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sgz)
July 10, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sgz)
July 7, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Euro Cargo Express Inc...(jgo)
July 7, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 7, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
July 7, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 23-cv-331. (jgo)
July 6, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Euro Cargo Express Inc. d/b/a ECX Global Logistics, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc., Navigators Management Company, Inc.(on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company, Inc.)..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 6, 2023 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 23-cv-00331 (LAP). Document filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc., Navigators Management Company, Inc.(on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company, Inc.)..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 6, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Navigators Group, Inc., Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Navigators Management Company, Inc.. Document filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc.(on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company, Inc.)..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 6, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Navigators Management Company, Inc.. Document filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc...(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 6, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Malley, Kevin)
July 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Euro Cargo Express Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27964154)Document filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc., Navigators Management Company, Inc.(on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company, Inc.)..(O'Malley, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navigators Management Company, Inc. et al v. Euro Cargo Express Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin John Byron O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Cargo Express Inc. doing business as ECX Global Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Shine Int'l Transportation Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Apex Cargo Consolidated Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?