Hargrove v. News Enterprises Inc.
Plaintiff: John Hargrove
Defendant: News Enterprises Inc., The Sun US, Inc., The UK Sun, News Group Newspapers Limited and News Enterprises, Inc. a Delaware Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv06045
Filed: July 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. News Group Newspapers Limited waiver sent on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. Document filed by John Hargrove..(Charleston, Katie)
September 1, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. News Enterprises, Inc. a Delaware Corporation waiver sent on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. Document filed by John Hargrove..(Charleston, Katie)
August 23, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to News Group Newspapers Limited..(jgo)
August 22, 2023 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to News Group Newspapers Limited, re: #17 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by John Hargrove..(Charleston, Katie)
August 22, 2023 Filing 17 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Amended Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, #15 Amended Complaint,, against News Group Newspapers Limited, News Enterprises, Inc. a Delaware Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hargrove. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, #15 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hargrove Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B- Assignment of Rights, #3 Exhibit Attachment Order Leave to File).(Charleston, Katie)
August 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Katie Charleston to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Katie Charleston to RE-FILE re: Document No. #15 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Add News Enterprises Inc. to CM ECF without any alias'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
August 21, 2023 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to News Group Newspapers Limited, re: #15 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by John Hargrove..(Charleston, Katie)
August 21, 2023 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Amended Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, against News Enterprises Inc., News Group Newspapers Limited with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hargrove. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hargrove Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B- Assignment of Rights, #3 Exhibit Attachment Order Leave to File).(Charleston, Katie) Modified on 8/22/2023 (pc).
August 17, 2023 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading, #8 Amended Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. #1 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's motion to file a Second Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 13). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/17/2023) (ate) Modified on 8/31/2023 (ate).
August 15, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading,,,, #8 Amended Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by John Hargrove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to File, #2 Exhibit B- Redline Proposed 2nd Am. Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Charleston, Katie)
August 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Katie Charleston to RE-FILE re: Document No. #11 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached; Court's leave has not been granted. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf)
August 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Katie Charleston to RE-FILE Document No. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 11, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to News Group Newspapers Limited, re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by John Hargrove..(Charleston, Katie)
August 11, 2023 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Amended Complaint against News Enterprises Inc., News Group Newspapers Limited with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hargrove. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hargrove Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B- Transfer of Ownership).(Charleston, Katie) Modified on 8/14/2023 (vf).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Katie Charleston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/3/2023) (rro)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Katie M. Charleston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Hargrove. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for PHV Appearance, #2 Proposed Order on Motion for PHV Appearance).(Charleston, Katie)
July 27, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Katie M. Charleston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against News Enterprises Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hargrove. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Copyright Registration).(Charleston, Katie)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 26, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) MUST IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL ATTORNEYS IN THIS ACTION BY SERVING UPON EACH OF THEM COPIES OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES. IF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) IS UNAWARE OF THE IDENTITY OF COUNSEL FOR ANY OF THE PARTIES, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) MUST IMMEDIATELY SEND COPIES OF THE NOTICE AND INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO THAT PARTY PERSONALLY. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/17/2023) (ama)
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to News Enterprises Inc.. (sj)
July 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Katie Charleston. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: News Enterprises Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
July 14, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Katie M. Charleston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27998335. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Courts of Texas, Florida and California; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (dsh)
July 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Katie Charleston. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $450,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $450,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
July 14, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 14, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
July 14, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 13, 2023 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by John Hargrove. Related Document Number: #4 ..(Charleston, Katie) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/14/2023 (dsh).
July 13, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Katie M. Charleston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27998335. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Hargrove. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance).(Charleston, Katie) Modified on 7/14/2023 (dsh).
July 13, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Charleston, Katie)
July 13, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEWS ENTERPRISES INC. a Delaware Corporation a/k/a The Sun US, Inc. a/k/a The UK Sun, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Hargrove..(Charleston, Katie)
July 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against News Enterprises Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27998104)Document filed by News Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hargrove Copyright Registrations).(Charleston, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hargrove v. News Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hargrove
Represented By: Katie Charleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sun US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The UK Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Group Newspapers Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Enterprises, Inc. a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?