State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc., Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC, Little Man Parking, LLC and JAJ Garage LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv06373
Filed: July 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pd Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Little Man Parking, LLC. (vf)
September 19, 2023 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC. (vf)
September 19, 2023 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc.. (vf)
September 19, 2023 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAJ Garage LLC. (vf)
September 18, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Little Man Parking, LLC, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
September 18, 2023 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
September 18, 2023 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc., re: #20 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
September 18, 2023 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAJ Garage LLC, re: #20 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
September 15, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #13 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, against 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc., Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC, JAJ Garage LLC, Little Man Parking, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Related document: #13 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,..(Phelan, Robert)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER with respect to #18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. By November 21, 2023, the parties shall submit their proposed case management plan and scheduling order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/15/2023) (jca)
September 15, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert William Phelan to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
September 15, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert William Phelan to RE-FILE Document No. #13 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
September 15, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert William Phelan to RE-FILE Document No. #15 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
September 14, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 22, 2023 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert W. Phelan dated September 14, 2023. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
September 14, 2023 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Little Man Parking, LLC, re: #13 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2023 (vf).
September 14, 2023 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC, re: #13 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2023 (vf).
September 14, 2023 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to, JAJ Garage LLC, re: #13 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2023 (vf).
September 14, 2023 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc., re: #13 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2023 (vf).
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Phelan, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2023 (vf).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 22, 2023, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/26/2023) (kv)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/26/2023) (kv)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/26/2023) (kv)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Little Man Parking, LLC. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc. (vf)
July 25, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert William Phelan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 1,500,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,500,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted. (vf)
July 25, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 25, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 25, 2023 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 24, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
July 24, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Little Man Parking, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
July 24, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company..(Phelan, Robert)
July 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Phelan, Robert)
July 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc., Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC, Little Man Parking, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28040207)Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company..(Phelan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate New Jersey Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 57 Ann Street Realty Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Ann Parking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Man Parking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAJ Garage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?