SitNet LLC v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Plaintiff: SitNet LLC
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv06389
Filed: July 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1341 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim Comparison Chart).(Seshens, Dana)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by SitNet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A - Comparison with Patent Ineligible Claims, #2 Appendix Appendix B - Comparison with Patent Eligible Claims, #3 Appendix Appendix C - Responsive Rule 8.G.i Chart).(Kannan, Naresh)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denis James Sullivan on behalf of SitNet LLC..(Sullivan, Denis)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #37 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Douglas J. Nash dated October 25, 2023. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 11/1/2023 Replies due by 11/15/2023.. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/25/2023) (jca)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Douglas J. Nash dated October 25, 2023. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Cook, John)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT ADDENDUM (PATENT): In addition to the deadlines specified in the civil case management plan and scheduling order, the Court adopts the following additional provisions: 1. Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions. Unless otherwise agreed to by the parties, no later than December 17, 2023, a party claiming patent infringement shall serve on all parties a "Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions." Separately for each opposing party, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions shall contain the following information: As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 4/26/2024.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/20/2023) (tg)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to concluding all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). The case is to be tried to a jury. Joinder of additional parties must be accomplished by January 10, 2024.Amended Pleadings may be filed without leave of Court until January 10, 2024. All factual depositions must be completed by July 17, 2024. Post-discovery summary judgment motions in the form prescribed by the Court's Individual Practices shall be served by October 16, 2024, answering papers by November 6, 2024, and reply papers by November 20, 2024. A final pre-trial conference shall be held on January 13, 2025. Jury selection (if applicable) and trial shall commence on January 20, 2025. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2024. Motions due by 10/16/2024. Responses due by 11/6/2024 Replies due by 11/20/2024. Expert Deposition due by 9/25/2024. Fact Discovery due by 7/17/2024. Expert Discovery due by 9/25/2024. Discovery due by 9/25/2024. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/20/2023) (tg)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Patent Addendum).(Seshens, Dana)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Bi on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Bi, Kathryn)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: As discussed at the October 5, 2023, conference, trial in this case will begin on January 20, 2025, and the final pretrial conference will be held on January 13, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. By October 20, 2023, at noon, the parties shall submit a revised case-management plan, working backward from those dates. Additionally, the parties are reminded to submit any proposed protective order promptly, and are encouraged to limit the use of "attorneys' eyes only" provisions. SO ORDERED. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/16/2023) (vfr)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arun Subramanian: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/5/2023. Douglas John Nash and Naresh Kumar Kannan present for Plaintiff. Ashok Ramani, Dana Seshens, and Kathryn Bi present for Defendant. (kh)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Douglas J. Nash dated October 2, 2023., #26 MOTION to Dismiss . The request is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close ECF 30. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 10/27/2023 Replies due by 11/10/2023. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/3/2023) (tg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Douglas J. Nash dated October 2, 2023. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Nash, Douglas)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of of Lead Trial Counsel. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Nash, Douglas)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Dana M. Seshens in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Chart of Claim Elements Not Plausibly Alleged), #2 Exhibit B (Redline of Memorandum of Law), #3 Exhibit C (Redline of Chart of Claim Elements Not Plausibly Alleged)).(Seshens, Dana)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Seshens, Dana)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 10/13/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss).(Seshens, Dana)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#26) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 10/13/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of claim elements not plausibly alleged, #2 Proposed Order Granting Meta's Motion to Dismiss).(Seshens, Dana) Modified on 10/2/2023 (lb).
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashok Ramani on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Ramani, Ashok)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Ashok Ramani ("Applicant"), for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. As further set forth by this Order. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 9/29/2023) (tg)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum).(Seshens, Dana)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Ashok Ramani dated September 28, 2023 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Seshens, Dana)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Lead Trial Counsel Designation. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Seshens, Dana)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Ashok Ramani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-28354374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of A. Ramani, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Seshens, Dana)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Seshens, Dana)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Meredith Seshens on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Seshens, Dana)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Ashok Ramani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-28354374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Naresh Kumar Kannan on behalf of SitNet LLC..(Kannan, Naresh)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Individual Practices in Civil Case served on Meta Platforms, Inc. on August 15, 2023. Service was accepted by Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Cook, John)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from John D. Cook dated August 16, 2023.. Meta Platforms, Inc. answer due 9/29/2023 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Arun Subramanian)(Text Only Order) (Subramanian, Arun)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from John D. Cook dated August 16, 2023. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Cook, John)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/5/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Arun Subramanian. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/9/2023) (vfr)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg G Gutzler on behalf of SitNet LLC..(Gutzler, Greg)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Arun Subramanian. Judge Valerie E. Caproni is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/27/2023, answer due 8/17/2023. Service was accepted by Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Cook, John)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/26/2023) (kgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Donald Cook on behalf of SitNet LLC..(Cook, John)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meta Platforms, Inc...(jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas John Nash. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Meta Platforms, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Nash, Douglas)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Nash, Douglas)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SitNet LLC..(Nash, Douglas)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nash, Douglas)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28043761)Document filed by SitNet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 11,470,682, #2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,877,345, #3 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,332,454, #4 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,249,932, #5 Exhibit Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit Claim Chart, #9 Exhibit Claim Chart, #10 Exhibit Prosecution History, #11 Exhibit Prosecution History, #12 Exhibit Prosecution History, #13 Exhibit Prosecution History, #14 Exhibit USA v. Meta Complaint, #15 Exhibit Publication, #16 Exhibit Publication, #17 Exhibit Publication, #18 Exhibit Publication, #19 Exhibit Publication, #20 Exhibit Publication, #21 Exhibit Publication, #22 Exhibit Publication, #23 Exhibit Publication, #24 Exhibit Publication, #25 Exhibit Publication, #26 Exhibit Publication, #27 Exhibit Publication, #28 Exhibit Publication, #29 Exhibit Publication, #30 Exhibit Publication, #31 Exhibit Publication, #32 Exhibit Publication, #33 Exhibit Publication, #34 Exhibit Publication, #35 Exhibit Publication, #36 Exhibit Publication, #37 Exhibit Publication, #38 Exhibit Publication, #39 Exhibit Publication, #40 Exhibit Publication, #41 Exhibit Publication, #42 Exhibit Publication, #43 Exhibit Publication, #44 Exhibit Publication, #45 Exhibit Publication, #46 Exhibit Publication, #47 Exhibit Publication, #48 Exhibit Publication, #49 Exhibit Publication, #50 Exhibit Publication, #51 Exhibit Publication, #52 Exhibit Publication, #53 Exhibit Publication, #54 Exhibit Publication, #55 Exhibit Publication, #56 Exhibit Publication, #57 Exhibit Publication, #58 Exhibit Publication, #59 Exhibit Publication, #60 Exhibit Publication, #61 Exhibit Publication, #62 Exhibit Publication, #63 Exhibit Publication, #64 Exhibit Publication, #65 Exhibit Publication, #66 Exhibit Publication, #67 Exhibit Publication).(Nash, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SitNet LLC v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SitNet LLC
Represented By: Douglas John Nash
Represented By: Greg G Gutzler
Represented By: John Donald Cook
Represented By: Naresh Kumar Kannan
Represented By: Denis James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Represented By: Kathryn Bi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?