Karen Williams Design, Ltd. v. E. Lawrence Design, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Williams Design, Ltd.
Defendant: E. Lawrence Design, LLC, RBL Metals, LLC, New Day Woodwork, Inc., Amy Schorr and Brian Schorr
Case Number: 1:2023cv06634
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Amy Schorr waiver sent on 8/17/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. Document filed by Karen Williams Design, Ltd...(Malbin, Alexander)
August 29, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brian Schorr waiver sent on 8/17/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. Document filed by Karen Williams Design, Ltd...(Malbin, Alexander)
August 2, 2023 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
August 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John F. Olsen on behalf of Karen Williams Design, Ltd...(Olsen, John)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/1/2023) (jca)
August 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund John Ferdinand, III on behalf of Karen Williams Design, Ltd...(Ferdinand, Edmund)
August 1, 2023 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Malbin, Alexander)
August 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Alexander Rudolf Malbin to RE-FILE re: Document No. #3 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; the incorrect Patent or Trademark field was selected on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (jgo)
August 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Karen Williams Design, Ltd...(Malbin, Alexander)
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Malbin, Alexander) Modified on 8/1/2023 (jgo).
July 31, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Malbin, Alexander)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E. Lawrence Design, LLC, New Day Woodwork, Inc., RBL Metals, LLC, Amy Schorr, Brian Schorr. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28074022)Document filed by Karen Williams Design, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Design Patent No. D895,333).(Malbin, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Williams Design, Ltd. v. E. Lawrence Design, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Williams Design, Ltd.
Represented By: Alexander Rudolf Malbin
Represented By: Edmund John Ferdinand, III
Represented By: John F. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Lawrence Design, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBL Metals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Day Woodwork, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Schorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Schorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?