Lurch, Jr. v. Pilgrim et al
Plaintiff: Robert Derek Lurch, Jr.
Defendant: P.O. Pilgrim and P.O. Avin
Case Number: 1:2023cv06727
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jessica G L Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. NYSID: 12684777N B&C:3102300365 Otis Bantum Correctional Center 16-00 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370 on 09/07/2023 Re: #6 Order. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (ta)
September 7, 2023 Mailed a copy of #1 Complaint, #6 Order, to Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, at 100 Church Street, New York, New York 10007..(ta)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VALENTIN ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail an information package to Plaintiff. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order and a copy of the complaint to the Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, at 100 Church Street, New York, New York 10007. A flyer, retainer, and intake form from NYLAG are attached to this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 9/5/2023) (tg)
September 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sgz)
September 1, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
August 21, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 8/15/23 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Derek Lurch. New Address: BC#3102300365, 16-00 Hazen St., E. Elmhurst, NY, 11370. (sc)
August 3, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Robert Derek Lurch,Jr. 151 Lawrence Street 4th Floor Brooklyn, NY 11201. (ta)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/2/2023) (vn)
July 31, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. (sac)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avin, Pilgrim. Document filed by Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. (sac)
July 31, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lurch, Jr. v. Pilgrim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Derek Lurch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Pilgrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Avin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?