Morrison et al v. JSP Life Agency Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lindon Morrison
Defendant: JSP Life Agency Inc. d/b/a JSP Home Care Services, Jose Nicanor Rodriguez and Nieves Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2023cv06943
Filed: August 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/29/2023) (rro)
September 29, 2023 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 10:30 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
September 28, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter and Case Management Plan. Document filed by Lindon Morrison..(Avshalumov, Roman)
September 18, 2023 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/18/2023.(sge)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by September 28, 2023, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/14/2023) (ama)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/28/2023. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/10/2019) (sge)
September 14, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah M Isaacson on behalf of JSP Life Agency Inc., Jose Nicanor Rodriguez, Nieves Rodriguez..(Isaacson, Deborah)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by JSP Life Agency Inc., Jose Nicanor Rodriguez, Nieves Rodriguez..(Diviney, John)
September 13, 2023 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JSP Life Agency Inc., Jose Nicanor Rodriguez, Nieves Rodriguez..(Diviney, John)
August 30, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. JSP Life Agency Inc. served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/13/2023. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT. Document filed by Lindon Morrison..(Avshalumov, Roman)
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. All Defendants. Service was accepted by JUDY (DOE) (REFUSED FULL NAME), FRONT DESK CLERK. Document filed by Lindon Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit JUDY (DOE) (REFUSED FULL NAME), CO-WORKER, #2 Affidavit JUDY (DOE) (REFUSED FULL NAME), CO-WORKER).(Avshalumov, Roman)
August 9, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JSP Life Agency Inc., Jose Nicanor Rodriguez, Nieves Rodriguez..(jgo)
August 8, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JSP LIFE AGENCY INC. d/b/a JSP HOME CARE SERVICES, JOSE NICANOR RODRIGUEZ and NIEVES RODRIGUEZ, as individuals, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lindon Morrison..(Avshalumov, Roman)
August 8, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 8, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc)
August 8, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Remove "Service via Secretary of State" from the Defendant name and address field;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lindon Morrison. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Avraham Y. Scher on behalf of Lindon Morrison(individually), Lindon Morrison(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Scher, Avraham)
August 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Lindon Morrison(individually), Lindon Morrison(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(O'Donnell, James)
August 7, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JSP LIFE AGENCY INC. d/b/a JSP HOME CARE SERVICES, JOSE NICANOR RODRIGUEZ and NIEVES RODRIGUEZ, as individuals, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lindon Morrison(individually), Lindon Morrison(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman) Modified on 8/8/2023 (pc).
August 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
August 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JSP Life Agency Inc., Jose Nicanor Rodriguez, Nieves Rodriguez. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28111071)Document filed by Lindon Morrison(individually), Lindon Morrison(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison et al v. JSP Life Agency Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindon Morrison
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSP Life Agency Inc. d/b/a JSP Home Care Services
Represented By: Deborah M Isaacson
Represented By: John K. Diviney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Nicanor Rodriguez
Represented By: Deborah M Isaacson
Represented By: John K. Diviney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nieves Rodriguez
Represented By: Deborah M Isaacson
Represented By: John K. Diviney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?