Yoon v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jiyoung Yoon
Defendant: Tesla Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv07354
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Tesla Motors, Inc...(Fazio, Peter)
September 29, 2023 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tesla Motors, Inc...(Fazio, Peter)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Andrew Parker Felix, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/20/2023) (vfr)
September 19, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Andrew Parker Felix, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually), Jiyoung Yoon(and as the Administratrix of the Estate of Jyung Woo Hahn, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Parker Felix, Esq., #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order re A Felix Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Felix, Andrew)
September 19, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Andrew Parker Felix, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 MOTION for Matt Brooks Hagler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Brooks Hagler, Esq., for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/14/2023) (jca)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 MOTION for Timothy Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of T. Michael Morgan, Esq., for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/13/2023) (jca)
September 13, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Matt Brooks Hagler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28283051. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually), Jiyoung Yoon(and as the Administratrix of the Estate of Jyung Woo Hahn, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of M. Brooks Hagler for PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of M. Brooks Hagler, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Granting PHV).(Hagler, Matt)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Timothy Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually), Jiyoung Yoon(and as the Administratrix of the Estate of Jyung Woo Hahn, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of T. Michael Morgan for PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of T. Michael Morgan, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Granting PHV).(Morgan, Timothy)
September 13, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Matt Brooks Hagler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28283051. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 13, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Timothy Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 12, 2023 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Andrew Parker Felix, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28273955. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Parker Felix, Esq., #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing of Andew Parker Felix, Esq., #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Andrew Parker Felix, Esq. Admission for Pro Hac Vice).(Felix, Andrew) Modified on 9/12/2023 (va).
September 12, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #10 MOTION for Andrew Parker Felix, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28273955. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT of California. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Timothy Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually), Jiyoung Yoon(and as the Administratrix of the Estate of Jyung Woo Hahn, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of T. Michael Morgan for PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of T. Michael Morgan, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Granting PHV).(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2023 (va).
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Timothy Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually), Jiyoung Yoon(and as the Administratrix of the Estate of Jyung Woo Hahn, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing to Appear PHV, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Granting PHV).(Morgan, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2023 (va).
September 11, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Timothy Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT of Florida. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
September 11, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Timothy Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT of Florida. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Steven E. Nauman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon)(Text Only Order) (aba)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Steven E. Nauman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28244657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven E. Nauman, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admissions Pro Hac Vice).(Nauman, Steven)
September 6, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Steven E. Nauman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28244657. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
August 22, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tesla Motors, Inc...(jgo)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/22/2023) (jca)
August 21, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tesla Motors, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon(individually), Jiyoung Yoon(and as the Administratrix of the Estate of Jyung Woo Hahn, Deceased)..(Sedgh, Jonathan)
August 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sedgh, Jonathan)
August 21, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jonathan M. Sedgh. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan M. Sedgh re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Jiyoung Yoon with party text 'as the Administratrix of the Estate of Jyung Woo Hahn, Deceased'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
August 21, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 21, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 21, 2023 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Jiyoung Yoon added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Jiyoung Yoon. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Sedgh, Jonathan)
August 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan M. Sedgh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JIYOUNG YOON; TESLA MOTORS, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TESLA MOTORS, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28169600)Document filed by JIYOUNG YOON..(Sedgh, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoon v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiyoung Yoon
Represented By: Andrew Parker Felix
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sedgh
Represented By: Matt Brooks Hagler
Represented By: Steven Nauman
Represented By: Timothy Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?