Goldstrom v. Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
Plaintiff: Seth Goldstrom
Defendant: Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
Interpleader: McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC and McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
3Rd Party Plaintiff: McKinsey & Co., Inc. and McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv07527
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: granting #49 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #49 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Reid M. Figel dated October 10, 2023. The Application is Granted. In the event that the motion to compel arbitration is denied, answers or motions in response to the Interpleader Complaint shall be due 21 days after such denial. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 49. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/10/2023) (ama)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER temporarily granting #43 Letter Motion to Seal. The motion to seal is granted temporarily. The Court will assess whether to keep the materials at issue sealed or redacted when deciding the underlying motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 43. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/10/23) (yv)
October 10, 2023 Filing 49 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Reid M. Figel dated October 10, 2023. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom..(Figel, Reid)
October 6, 2023 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Ronald C. Minkoff in Support re: #44 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Stay Case, and Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Motion.. Document filed by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9).(Minkoff, Ronald)
October 6, 2023 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Stay Case, and Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Motion. (Redacted). Document filed by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Minkoff, Ronald)
October 6, 2023 Filing 46 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Ronald C. Minkoff in Support re: #44 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Stay Case, and Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Motion.. Document filed by McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC, McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, Seth Goldstrom, Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #43 .(Minkoff, Ronald)
October 6, 2023 Filing 45 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Stay Case, and Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Motion. . Document filed by McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, Seth Goldstrom, Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #43 .(Minkoff, Ronald)
October 6, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Stay Case, and Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Motion. Document filed by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Minkoff, Ronald)
October 6, 2023 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of Motion to Compel, Declaration, and Accompanying Exhibits addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ronald C. Minkoff dated October 6, 2023. Document filed by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Minkoff, Ronald)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The conference previously scheduled for October 11, 2023, at 2:45 p.m., is hereby adjourned sine die. (Note that the conference in Alix scheduled for the same day remains in effect.) The parties' briefing schedule proposed above is hereby adopted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 41. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/28/23) (yv)
September 28, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/6/2023. Responses due by 10/27/2023. Replies due by 11/10/2023. (yv)
September 28, 2023 Filing 41 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Lauren J. Zimmerman dated September 28, 2023. Document filed by Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The conference previously scheduled for September 21, 2023, is hereby rescheduled to October 11, 2023, at 2:45 p.m., in Courtroom 1105 pursuant to ECF No. 6. No later than September 28, 2023, the parties shall submit a joint status letter describing the status of potential joinder of other defendants. For the moment, all other answer and response deadlines in the case are extended to October 17, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 39. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 10/11/2023 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/15/23) (yv)
September 14, 2023 Filing 39 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Other Deadlines and Joint Report of Counsel addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ronald C. Minkoff dated September 14, 2023. Document filed by McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Minkoff, Ronald)
September 7, 2023 Filing 38 REDACTION to #11 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,, by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21).(Minkoff, Ronald)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #33 Letter Motion to Seal. Application GRANTED. The Court concludes that the interest of third-party interpleader Defendants (the "McKinsey Defendants") in maintaining the confidentiality of information related to their legal representation, especially in light of their position that the matter is subject to arbitration, justifies the proposed limited redactions. This decision is subject to reevaluation upon the resolution of any motion to compel arbitration. See Stafford v. Int'l Bus. Machines Corp., No. 22-1240, 2023 WL 5183546, at *5 (2d Cir. Aug. 14, 2023) (holding that a district court erred by unsealing confidential information from an arbitration). The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain ECF No. 31 under seal in its entirety, and the McKinsey Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file the correct redacted versions for public viewing no later than September 11, 2023. The Clerk of Court is also directed to terminate ECF Nos. 30 and 33. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/7/2023) (tg)
September 6, 2023 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of redacted Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Statement of Relatedness, August 28, 2023 Order, Letter Motion to Seal Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaim for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief, and Answer, sealed Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaim for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief, and Answer (with Exhibits), August 31, 2023 Order Granting Letter Motion to Seal, Summonses as to Third-Party Interpleader Defendants, ECF Rules & Instructions, Judge Furman's Civil Individual Practices, Judge Furman's Individual Practices for Hearings and Trials, and Magistrate Judge Willis's Individual Practices for Civil Cases served on MCKINSEY & CO., INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY INC. UNITED STATES, MCKINSEY HOLDINGS, INC., and MCKINSEY RECOVERY & TRANSFORMATION SERVICES U.S. LLC on September 1, 2023. Service was made by e-mail. Document filed by Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
September 6, 2023 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order dated August 28, 2023 and Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases for Jesse M. Furman, United States District Judge served on Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC on 08/29/2023. Service was accepted by Lauren Zimmerman, Partner. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom..(Figel, Reid)
September 6, 2023 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. Service was accepted by Lauren Zimmerman, Partner. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom..(Figel, Reid)
September 6, 2023 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION to Seal ECF No. 31 in its entirety and for permission to replace it with the Interpleader Complaint with proposed redactions and the Exhibits redacted in their entirety addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ronald C. Minkoff dated September 6, 2023. Document filed by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States..(Minkoff, Ronald)
September 5, 2023 Filing 32 ***SELECTED PARTIES***ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC, McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey Holdings, Inc.., COUNTERCLAIM against Seth Goldstrom. Document filed by McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC, Seth Goldstrom, Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC, McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #30 .(Minkoff, Ronald)
September 5, 2023 Filing 31 REDACTION to #11 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,, Letter Motion to Keep Portions Under Seal Previously Filed (ECF No. 30) by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21).(Minkoff, Ronald)
September 5, 2023 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of the Interpleader Complaint and all the accompanying Exhibits addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ronald C. Minkoff dated September 5, 2023. Document filed by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Minkoff, Ronald)
September 1, 2023 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC. (sj)
September 1, 2023 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKinsey Holdings, Inc.. (sj)
September 1, 2023 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKinsey & Company Inc. United States. (sj)
September 1, 2023 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKinsey & Co., Inc.. (sj)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The conference previously scheduled for September 6, 2023, is hereby adjourned to September 21, 2023, at 2:30 p.m., and will be held in Courtroom 1105 pursuant to ECF No. 6. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 24. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/1/23) (yv)
August 31, 2023 Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 6, 2023 and for an extension of September 1, 2023 meet-and-confer deadline addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Ronald C. Minkoff dated August 31, 2023. Document filed by McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Minkoff, Ronald)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Elliston Perot Bissell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting temporarily #10 Letter Motion to Seal. The motion to seal is granted temporarily. The Court will re-evaluate upon any submission by third-party McKinsey or if the Court receives a motion to unseal. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 10. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/31/2023) (tg)
August 31, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Regina Gerhardt on behalf of McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Gerhardt, Regina)
August 31, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John B. Harris on behalf of McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Harris, John)
August 31, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Charles Minkoff on behalf of McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC..(Minkoff, Ronald)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Robert Conrad Klipper to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 31, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Elliston Perot Bissell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28225784. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Bissell, Elliston)
August 31, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Robert Conrad Klipper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28222415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Klipper, Robert)
August 31, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MCKINSEY RECOVERY & TRANSFORMATION SERVICES U.S. LLC, re: #11 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,. Document filed by Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
August 31, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MCKINSEY HOLDINGS, INC., re: #11 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,. Document filed by Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
August 31, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MCKINSEY & COMPANY INC. UNITED STATES, re: #11 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,. Document filed by Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MCKINSEY & CO., INC., re: #11 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,. Document filed by Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
August 31, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Robert Conrad Klipper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28222415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 31, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Elliston Perot Bissell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28225784. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
August 30, 2023 Filing 11 ***SELECTED PARTIES***ANSWER to #1 Complaint., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC, McKinsey & Co., Inc., McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States., COUNTERCLAIM against Seth Goldstrom. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom, Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- 2018.03.15 Engagement Letter, #2 Exhibit 2- 2018.10.09 S. Goldstrom Waiver, #3 Exhibit 3- 2018.10.09 McKinsey Waiver 1, #4 Exhibit 4- 2018.10.09 McKinsey Waiver 2, #5 Exhibit 5- 2022.11.03 Letter from Kellogg to SGE, #6 Exhibit 6- 2022.11.11 Letter from SGE to Kellogg, #7 Exhibit 7- 2022.11.28 Email from Kellogg to SGE, #8 Exhibit 8- 2022.12.05 Email from SGE to Kellogg, #9 Exhibit 9- 2022.12.23 Letter from Kellogg to SGE, #10 Exhibit 10- 2023.01.10 Letter from Kellogg to SGE, #11 Exhibit 11- 2023.01.13 Email from SGE to Kellogg, #12 Exhibit 12- 2023.01.13 Letter from Kellogg to SGE, #13 Exhibit 13- 2023.01.16 Letter from SGE to Kellogg, #14 Exhibit 14- 2023.01.16 Letter from Frankfurt to SGE, #15 Exhibit 15- 2023.01.23 Letter from Kellogg to SGE, #16 Exhibit 16- 2023.01.27 Letter from SGE to Kellogg, #17 Exhibit 17- 2023.01.27 Letter from SGE to Kellogg, #18 Exhibit 18- 2023.01.30 Email from SGE to Kellogg, #19 Exhibit 19- 2023.02.07 Letter from SGE to Kellogg, #20 Exhibit 20- 2023.02.08 Email from Kellogg to SGE, #21 Exhibit 21- 2023.02.10 Letter from SGE to Kellogg)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #10 .(Zimmerman, Lauren)
August 30, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Seal Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaim for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief, and Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Lauren J. Zimmerman dated August 30, 2023. Document filed by Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
August 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Flugman on behalf of Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Flugman, David)
August 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Jillian Zimmerman on behalf of Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(Zimmerman, Lauren)
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC..(jgo)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an in person conference with the Court on September 6, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/28/23) (yv)
August 28, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
August 28, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-04141-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
August 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (tro)
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Seth Goldstrom..(Figel, Reid)
August 25, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 18-cv-4141. (jgo)
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
August 24, 2023 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-4141 (JMF). Document filed by Seth Goldstrom..(jgo) (pc).
August 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(jgo) (pc).
August 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 20317)Document filed by Seth Goldstrom..(jgo) (pc).
August 24, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 23-MC-293 (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/23/2023) (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstrom v. Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Goldstrom
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Elliston Perot Bissell
Represented By: Robert Klipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
Represented By: Lauren Jillian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Scott Flugman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: McKinsey & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Regina Gerhardt
Represented By: Ronald Charles Minkoff
Represented By: John B. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Charles Minkoff
Represented By: John B. Harris
Represented By: Regina Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?