Bell Northern Research, LLC v. Shenzhen Tinno Mobile Technology Corp et al
Plaintiff: Bell Northern Research, LLC
Defendant: Shenzhen Tinno Mobile Technology Corp and Tinno USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv07583
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer H Rearden
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Filing 21 ***SELECTED PARTIES***SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ,EXHIBIT A. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC, Tinno USA Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #20 .(Richter, Paul)
October 20, 2023 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Paul Richter dated October 20, 2023. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC..(Richter, Paul)
October 20, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tinno USA, Inc.. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit P. Richter, #2 Proposed Order Default Judgment).(Richter, Paul)
October 17, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Tinno USA Inc.(nd)
October 17, 2023 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Paul Richter re: #16 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default . Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Richter, Paul)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC..(Richter, Paul) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/17/2023 (nd).
October 16, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE served on Tinno USA Inc. on 10/16/2023. Service was accepted by A Registered Agent, Inc.. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC..(Richter, Paul)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, by October 20, 2023, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed as to Tinno USA Inc. for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Plaintiff may show cause by properly submitting a motion for default judgment, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases (available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-h-rearden), which require obtaining a certificate of default by the Clerk of Court prior to filing a motion for default judgment. Failure to submit a timely and proper motion for default judgment may result in dismissal of this action as to Tinno USA Inc. under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. If or when a motion for default judgment is filed, the Court will enter a further order setting a deadline for any opposition and reply and, if appropriate, scheduling a date and time for a default judgment hearing. Plaintiff shall electronically serve a copy of this Order on Tinno USA Inc. within two business days of the date of this Order and shall file proof of such service within three business days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 10/12/2023) (ama)
September 6, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Tinno USA Inc. served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. Service was accepted by Charlotte Banice, registered agent. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC..(Richter, Paul)
August 30, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tinno USA Inc...(jgo)
August 30, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shenzhen Tinno Mobile Technology Corp..(jgo)
August 29, 2023 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Richter, Paul)
August 29, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tinno USA Inc., re: #7 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC..(Richter, Paul)
August 29, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shenzhen Tinno Mobile Technology Corp, re: #7 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC..(Richter, Paul)
August 29, 2023 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Shenzhen Tinno Mobile Technology Corp, Tinno USA Inc.. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-U.S. Patent No. 8,204,554, #2 Exhibit B-U.S. Patent No. 7,319,889, #3 Exhibit C-U.S. Patent No. RE 48,629, #4 Exhibit D-U.S. Patent No 8,416,862, #5 Exhibit E-U.S. Patent No. 7,564,914, #6 Exhibit F-U.S. Patent No. 7,957,450, #7 Exhibit G-U.S. Patent No. 6,941,156, #8 Exhibit H-U.S. Patent No. 6,696,941, #9 Exhibit I-U.S. Patent No. 7,039,435, #10 Exhibit J-U.S. Patent No. 6,963,129, #11 Exhibit K-U.S. Patent No. 6,858,930, #12 Exhibit L-U.S. Patent No. 8,396,072, #13 Exhibit M-U.S. Patent No. 8,792,432).(Richter, Paul)
August 29, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Richter, Paul) Modified on 8/29/2023 (pc).
August 29, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul Max Richter, Jr. to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): office was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
August 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul Max Richter, Jr. to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; File each summons separately or create one summons form with each party's name and address listed on a rider;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paul Max Richter, Jr. to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct, each exhibit must be labeled the type of document it is (United States Patent, etc.). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
August 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Paul Max Richter, Jr.. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendants SHENZHEN Tinno MOBILE TECHNOLOGY CORP. and Tinno USA INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 2nd Summons for Issuance).(Richter, Paul) Modified on 8/28/2023 (pc).
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc., Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC for Bell Northern Research, LLC. Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC..(Richter, Paul)
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Richter, Paul)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28200714)Document filed by Bell Northern Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M).(Richter, Paul) Modified on 8/28/2023 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell Northern Research, LLC v. Shenzhen Tinno Mobile Technology Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bell Northern Research, LLC
Represented By: Paul Max Richter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Tinno Mobile Technology Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinno USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?