Center for Constitutional Rights v. United States Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights
Defendant: United States Department of Defense, United States Department of State and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv07689
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State..(Kim, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/21/2023) (tg)
September 21, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Wells Dixon on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights..(Dixon, Jonathan)
September 21, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Department of Defense answer due 10/23/2023; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 10/23/2023; United States Department of State answer due 10/23/2023. (tg)
September 20, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file the Governments response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Elizabeth J. Kim dated September 20, 2023. Document filed by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State..(Kim, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J. Kim on behalf of United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State..(Kim, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Sadaf Doost to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/20/2023) (mml)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Christopher Godshall-Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/20/2023) (mml)
September 11, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Sadaf Doost to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28268159. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sadaf Doost, #2 Supplement California Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Appear PHV).(Doost, Sadaf)
September 11, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Sadaf Doost to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28268159. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
September 5, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. United States Department of State served on 9/1/2023, answer due 9/22/2023. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights..(Azmy, Baher)
September 5, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 9/1/2023, answer due 9/22/2023. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights..(Azmy, Baher)
September 5, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. United States Department of Defense served on 9/1/2023, answer due 9/22/2023. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights..(Azmy, Baher)
September 5, 2023 Filing 10 FIRST MOTION for Christopher Godshall-Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28239589. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notarized Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Godshall-Bennett, Christopher)
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Naomi Ruth Tsu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28238685. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit notorized affidavit, #2 Exhibit certificate of good standing - Georgia, #3 Exhibit certificate of standing - CA, #4 Proposed Order proposed order).(Tsu, Naomi) Modified on 9/5/2023 (sgz).
September 5, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Naomi Ruth Tsu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28238685. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California 415-865-7000;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
September 5, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 FIRST MOTION for Christopher Godshall-Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28239589. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 31, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(jgo)
August 31, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(jgo)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense..(jgo)
August 31, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 31, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 31, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 30, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights..(Azmy, Baher)
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights..(Azmy, Baher)
August 30, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights..(Azmy, Baher)
August 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Azmy, Baher)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28214980)Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request).(Azmy, Baher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Constitutional Rights v. United States Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Christopher Godshall-Bennett
Represented By: Jonathan Wells Dixon
Represented By: Naomi Tsu
Represented By: Sadaf Doost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?