Buch v. Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Buch
Defendant: Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer and Coty Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv08854
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Cathy Buch. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline of Amended Complaint compared to original Complaint).(Gershon, A.)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by December 1, 2023. Any amended complaint should be filed with a redline showing all differences between the original and revised filing. Plaintiff will not be given any further opportunity to amend the Complaint to address issues raised by the motion to dismiss. If Plaintiff does amend, by December 22, 2023, Defendants shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) file a letter on ECF stating that they rely on the previously filed motion to dismiss. If Defendants file an answer or a new motion to dismiss, the Court will deny the previously filed motion to dismiss as moot. If Defendants file a new motion to dismiss or indicates that they rely on their previously filed motion to dismiss, any opposition shall be filed by January 12, 2024, and any reply shall be filed by January 19, 2024. If no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by December 1, 2023. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by December 8, 2023. Finally, it is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for November 29, 2023, and the requirement to file a joint status letter in advance of the conference is ADJOURNED, sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 11/9/2023) ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2023., Motions due by 12/22/2023., Responses due by 1/12/2024, Replies due by 1/19/2024.) (ks)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Scott D. Musoff in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule 14A of Coty Inc., dated September 21, 2023, #2 Exhibit B - Form 8-K of Coty Inc., dated May 4, 2023, #3 Exhibit C - Form 8-K of Coty Inc., dated July 1, 2020, #4 Exhibit D - Schedule 14A of Coty Inc., dated September 23, 2021, #5 Exhibit E - Schedule 14A of Coty Inc., dated September 21, 2022, #6 Exhibit F - Exhibit 3.1 to Form 10-K of Coty Inc., dated August 22, 2023, #7 Exhibit G - Form 8-K of Coty Inc., dated November 10, 2021).(Musoff, Scott)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer..(Musoff, Scott)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer..(Musoff, Scott)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying #7 Letter Motion to Expedite. Application DENIED. Because Defendants have not yet moved to dismiss the Complaint, the automatic stay described in 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(B) does not apply. Plaintiff's request for discovery is governed by Rule 26(d), which allows for discovery prior to conferral as required by Rule 26(f) "by stipulation[] or by court order." Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1). "When determining whether to grant expedited discovery, courts in this District apply a flexible standard of reasonableness and good cause." SingularDTV, GmbH v. Doe, 637 F. Supp. 3d 38, 42 (S.D.N.Y. 2022) (internal quotation marks and ellipses omitted). "This test requires a district court to examine the request on the entirety of the record to date and the reasonableness of the request in light of all the surrounding circumstances." In re Keurig Green Mountain Single-serve Coffee Antitrust Litig., No. 14 Misc. 2542, 2014 WL 12959675, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. July 23, 2014) (internal quotation marks omitted). Plaintiff does not establish good cause or reasonableness in her request. Plaintiff does not seek preliminary injunctive relief, a common basis for granting expedited discovery, see id. at *2, and almost one month passed between the release of the proxy statement on September 21 and Plaintiff's request for relief on October 18. Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss, which would operate to automatically stay all discovery, and the concerns animating the PSLRA, namely, perceived abuses of securities class actions to obtain settlements, see In re Kingate Mgmt. Ltd. Litig., 784 F.3d 128, 138 (2d Cir. 2015), further counsel against granting expedited discovery. Koppel v. 4987 Corp., 167 F.3d 125 (2d Cir. 1999), on which Plaintiff relies, does not require a different result. There, the panel only noted in dicta that courts generally favor injunctive relief over damages for violations of proxy rules, in part to encourage securities plaintiffs to allow corporations to remedy any defects in a proxy statement before a shareholder vote. Id. at 137-38. Defendants are aware of Plaintiff's claims and represent that they "are not interested in settlement discussions at this stage," Dkt. No. 38, at 2, making Koppel inapposite. So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 7. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 10/25/23) (yv)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #7 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule of Discovery in Aid of Considering the Possibilities of Promptly Settling or Resolving the Case and Lift the Stay of Discovery under 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(B) on the Grounds of Undue Prejudice addresse . Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from A. Arnold Gershon dated October 24, 2023 re: Reply in Support of Letter Motion. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Scott D. Musoff dated October 23, 2023 re: Response to Plaintiff's Letter, ECF 7. Document filed by Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer..(Musoff, Scott)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order (Docket No. 8) served on Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer and Coty Inc. on October 18, 2023. Service was accepted by Paul J. Lockwood, Scott Musoff, Lauren Aguiar, and Thomas Allen of Skadden Arps. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent, Other Affiliate JAB Holdings, B.V., for Coty Inc.. Document filed by Coty Inc...(Musoff, Scott)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Francis Allen on behalf of Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer..(Allen, Thomas)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Emily Aguiar on behalf of Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer..(Aguiar, Lauren)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer..(Musoff, Scott)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Robert Singer on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Lubomira Rochet on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Isabelle Parize on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Sue Nabi on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Anna Adeola Makanju on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Johannes P. Huth on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Peter Harf on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Olivier Goudet on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Joachim Creus on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Beatrice Ballini on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on Coty, Inc. on 10/18/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Robert Singer served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Lubomira Rochet served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Isabelle Parize served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Sue Nabi served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Anna Adeola Makanju served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Johannes P. Huth served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Peter Harf served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Olivier Goudet served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joachim Creus served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Beatrice Ballini served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Coty Inc. served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER with respect to #7 Letter Motion to Expedite. Defendants may file a response, not to exceed three pages, by October 23, 2023. Plaintiff shall serve this order on Defendants and file proof of service on ECF as soon as practicable and no later than October 19, 2023. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 10/18/2023) (mml)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule of Discovery in Aid of Considering the Possibilities of Promptly Settling or Resolving the Case and Lift the Stay of Discovery under 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(B) on the Grounds of Undue Prejudice addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from A. Arnold Gershon dated October 17, 2023. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/23/2023. (mml)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer..(pc)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer and Coty Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on November 29, 2023 at 11:30 A.M. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 351 474 997, followed by the pound (#) sign, as further set forth herein. Initial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge Dale E Ho. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 11/11/2023) (mml)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney A. Arnold Gershon to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant's as to whom the summons request is for must be listed in the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cathy Buch..(Gershon, A.) Modified on 10/11/2023 (sj).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gershon, A.)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney A. Arnold Gershon to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui, Beatrice Ballini, Coty Inc., Joachim Creus, Olivier Goudet, Peter Harf, Johannes P. Huth, Anna Adeola Makanju, Sue Nabi, Isabelle Parize, Lubomira Rochet, Robert Singer. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28397526)Document filed by Cathy Buch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Gershon, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buch v. Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Buch
Represented By: A. Arnold Gershon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Asuncion Aramburuzabala Larregui
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice Ballini
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joachim Creus
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivier Goudet
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Harf
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johannes P. Huth
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Adeola Makanju
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Nabi
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabelle Parize
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubomira Rochet
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Singer
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?