DISH Technologies L.L.C. et al v. BritBox, LLC
Plaintiff: DISH Technologies L.L.C. and Sling TV L.L.C.
Defendant: BritBox, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv08971
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The requested extension to December 22, 2023 is granted. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
November 2, 2023 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Eric Faragi dated November 2, 2023. Document filed by DISH Technologies L.L.C., Sling TV L.L.C...(Faragi, Eric)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. BritBox, LLC served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. Service was accepted by Legal Representative of Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by DISH Technologies L.L.C.; Sling TV L.L.C...(Faragi, Eric)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Faragi, Eric)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BritBox, LLC. (vf)
October 13, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 13, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Eric Joseph Faragi to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
October 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eric Joseph Faragi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH Network L.L.C., Corporate Parent DISH DBS Corporation, Corporate Parent Sling TV Holding L.L.C., Corporate Parent DISH Technologies L.L.C. for Sling TV L.L.C.. Document filed by Sling TV L.L.C...(Faragi, Eric)
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH DBS Corporation for DISH Technologies L.L.C.. Document filed by DISH Technologies L.L.C...(Faragi, Eric)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BritBox, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by DISH Technologies L.L.C., Sling TV L.L.C...(Faragi, Eric)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faragi, Eric)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BritBox, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28417339)Document filed by DISH Technologies L.L.C., Sling TV L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O-1, #16 Exhibit O-2, #17 Exhibit O-3, #18 Exhibit O-4, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z).(Faragi, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Technologies L.L.C. et al v. BritBox, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Technologies L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Faragi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sling TV L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Faragi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BritBox, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?