BTL Industries, Inc. v. Bioskin Laser LLC et al
Plaintiff: BTL Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Bioskin Laser LLC, Bioskin Laser II LLC and santa cohen
Case Number: 1:2023cv09104
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The conference scheduled for December 6, 2023, is CANCELLED pending consideration of Plaintiff's forthcoming motion for default judgment. Plaintiff shall file its default judgment papers by January 5, 2024. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/29/2023) (ama)
November 29, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/5/2024. (ama)
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Pre-trial Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Padmaja Chinta dated 11-27-2023. Document filed by BTL Industries, Inc...(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Santa Cohen served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. Service was accepted by Fay Way, Co-tenant. Service was made by mail. Document filed by BTL Industries, Inc...(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Bioskin Laser II LLC served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; Bioskin Laser LLC served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. Service was accepted by Fay Vineshanker, Manager. Document filed by BTL Industries, Inc...(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on at 4:10 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter passcode 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure that they are dialed into the call by the appointed conference time. As further set forth by this Order. This order supersedes and vacates the scheduling order dated October 18, 2023. Initial Conference set for 12/6/2023 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/24/2023) (tg)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 10/24/2023, Doc. #9 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on December 6, 2023 at 4:10p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth herein. Initial Conference set for 12/6/2023 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/18/2023) (mml) Modified on 10/24/2023 (tg).
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bioskin Laser II LLC, Bioskin Laser LLC, Santa Cohen..(pc)
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
October 17, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bioskin Laser LLC, Bioskin Laser II LLC, Santa Cohen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BTL Industries, Inc...(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 17, 2023 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BTL Holding Limited for BTL Industries, Inc.. Document filed by BTL Industries, Inc...(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bioskin Laser II LLC, Bioskin Laser LLC, santa cohen. Document filed by BTL Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Webpage printout, #2 Exhibit 2- Press release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Awards, #4 Exhibit 4 - Patent, #5 Exhibit 5 - TSDR status copies, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letters).(Chinta, Padmaja)
October 17, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 17, 2023 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-28432817, paid on 10/16/2023..(pc)
October 17, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Padmaja Chinta to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 10/23/2023. (pc)
October 17, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 17, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 17, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Padmaja Chinta. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
October 17, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Padmaja Chinta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BTL Industries, Inc. v. Bioskin Laser LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BTL Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Padmaja Chinta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioskin Laser LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioskin Laser II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: santa cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?