Leatherback Limited v. Adubifa
Plaintiff: Leatherback Limited
Defendant: Lolu Adubifa
Case Number: 1:2023cv09295
Filed: October 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Referring Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant has not yet been served as required under Rule 4(c). Because Mr. Adubifa has actual notice of this action, the parties are encouraged to discuss waiver of service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Defendant is apprised that Rule 4(d)(e) states that "[w]aiving service of a summons does not waive any objection to personal jurisdiction or to venue." In the event the parties are unable to come to agreement on waiving service, Plaintiff shall effectuate proper service within the period of time required under the Rules. The parties are apprised that all communications with Chambers should be filed on the public docket via ECF. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 12/19/2023) (ks)
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lolu Adubifa served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. Service was accepted by ADAM YOHANAN, ATTORNEY. Document filed by Leatherback Limited..(Kolawole, Jimi)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Dale E Ho. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 401 509 139, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 11/6/2023) (ks)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Reopen re: #13 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Not Transfer To Eastern District addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Jimi Kolawole dated 10/29/2023. On the record before the Court, namely the allegation that Ms. Mateen viewed the allegedly defamatory communications in Manhattan, venue is proper in the Southern District of New York. See 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2). Transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406 is therefore not necessary. So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 13.. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 11/6/2023) (ks)
October 29, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Not Transfer To Eastern District addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Jimi Kolawole dated 10/29/2023. Document filed by Leatherback Limited..(Kolawole, Jimi)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by November 3, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a letter on ECF, not to exceed three pages, explaining why this case should not be transferred to the Eastern District of New York, for lack of proper venue in the Southern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 10/25/2023) (ks)
October 25, 2023 Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Olufolajimi "Jimi" Kolawole. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 7. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 10/25/2023) (tg)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lolu Adubifa. (vf)
October 25, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Olufolajimi Kolawole to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Lolu Adubifa. Document filed by Leatherback Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Kolawole, Jimi)
October 24, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lolu Adubifa, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leatherback Limited..(Kolawole, Jimi)
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Olufolajimi Kolawole to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Leatherback Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kolawole, Jimi)
October 24, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jimi Kolawole to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect case number is on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
October 24, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Olufolajimi Kolawole to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28465627. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Olufolajimi Kolawole to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28465627. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Leatherback Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing).(Kolawole, Jimi) Modified on 10/24/2023 (sgz).
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LOLU ADUBIFA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leatherback Limited..(Kolawole, Jimi) Modified on 10/24/2023 (gp).
October 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jimi Kolawole to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
October 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jimi Kolawole. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LEATHERBACK LIMITED, LOLU ADUBIFA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
October 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jimi Kolawole. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff (none) ; Citizenship Defendant (none); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (sj)
October 23, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jimi Kolawole to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 23, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
October 23, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 23, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
October 22, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU NOTICE of Summons re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by LEATHERBACK LIMITED..(Kolawole, Jimi) Modified on 10/23/2023 (sj).
October 22, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kolawole, Jimi)
October 22, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LEATHERBACK LIMITED..(Kolawole, Jimi)
October 21, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR 0COMPLAINT against LOLU ADUBIFA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28458975)Document filed by LEATHERBACK LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Kolawole, Jimi) Modified on 10/23/2023 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leatherback Limited v. Adubifa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leatherback Limited
Represented By: Jimi Kolawole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolu Adubifa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?