mCom IP, LLC v. Amalgamated Bank
Plaintiff: mCom IP, LLC
Defendant: Trustee Amalgamated Bank and Amalgamated Bank
Case Number: 1:2023cv09550
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1341 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Conference re Request for Stay of Discovery. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Resolution Report).(Goldberger, Daniel)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Amalgamated Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PTAB Judgment).(Goldberger, Daniel)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank..(Goldberger, Daniel)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. There shall be no further extension. #1 Complaint. Amalgamated Bank answer due 12/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/20/2023) (vfr)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Document filed by mCom IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Ramey, William)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/5/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/20/2023) (vfr)
November 14, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-08801-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
November 14, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
November 14, 2023 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Document filed by mCom IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Amalgamated Bank served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. Service was accepted by Virgilio Baez. Document filed by mCom IP, LLC..(Ramey, William)
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
November 1, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amalgamated Bank. (vf)
November 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David John Hoffman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
November 1, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 1, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney David John Hoffman to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct AND the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (gp)
November 1, 2023 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 1, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PDF and EVENT ERROR NOTICE of Notice of Related Cases. Document filed by mCom IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Hoffman, David) Modified on 11/1/2023 (gp).
October 31, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by mCom IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
October 31, 2023 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hoffman, David)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amalgamated Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by mCom IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Notice on Report on Filing Action in a Patent Case AO-120. Document filed by mCom IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hoffman, David)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amalgamated Bank. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28503242)Document filed by mCom IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Hoffman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: mCom IP, LLC v. Amalgamated Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mCom IP, LLC
Represented By: David John Hoffman
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Amalgamated Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Bank
Represented By: Daniel Poul Goldberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?