Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co. v. Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.
Defendant: Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv09555
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jessica G L Clarke
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Royal Alliance Associates, Inc...(Paley, Meredith)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Bentley, Lisa)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lisa Dennis Bentley to RE-FILE Document No. #20 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. The pleading is not properly signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Bentley, Lisa) Modified on 12/22/2023 (vf).
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #12 Letter Motion to Seal. For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the request to redact the Complaint. No later than December 18, 2023, Defendant shall provide to Plaintiff a redacted version of the Complaint that conforms to this Order. Plaintiff shall file the redacted version of the Complaint by December 21, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF Nos. 9 and 12. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 12/12/2023) (rro)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall submit the settlement/confidentiality agreements referenced in ECF Nos. 12 and 17 no later than December 1, 2023. The parties shall submit the documents in camera to ClarkeNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 11/28/2023) (tg)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Lisa D. Bentley dated November 13, 2023 re: #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Meredith S.Paley, Esq. dated November 9, 2023. . Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Filing).(Bentley, Lisa)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Meredith S.Paley, Esq. dated November 9, 2023. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file any opposition, not to exceed five pages, no later than November 15, 2023. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 11/13/2023) (stt)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Weiner on behalf of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Weiner, Ryan)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Meredith S.Paley, Esq. dated November 9, 2023. Highlighted Redactions by Royal Alliance Associates, Inc., Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Paley, Meredith)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REDACTION to #12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Meredith S.Paley, Esq. dated November 9, 2023. Exhibit A - Proposed Redactions by Royal Alliance Associates, Inc..(Paley, Meredith)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Meredith S.Paley, Esq. dated November 9, 2023. Document filed by Royal Alliance Associates, Inc...(Paley, Meredith)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference/Individual Rules served on Royal Alliance Associates, Inc. on November 6, 2023. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Bentley, Lisa)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meredith Sharoky Paley on behalf of Royal Alliance Associates, Inc...(Paley, Meredith)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Lisa D. Bentley dated November 6, 2023. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Bentley, Lisa)
November 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Royal Alliance Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Bentley, Lisa)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 7, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by Microsoft Teams. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jessica-g-l- clarke. All parties are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 11/3/2023) (tg)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Primary Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Excess Policy).(Bentley, Lisa)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.. (vf)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lisa Dennis Bentley. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lisa Dennis Bentley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lisa Dennis Bentley to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intact Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. for Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Bentley, Lisa)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Royal Alliance Associates, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co...(Bentley, Lisa)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bentley, Lisa)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28503849)Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Primary Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Excess Policy).(Bentley, Lisa) Modified on 11/1/2023 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co. v. Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Lisa Dennis Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Alliance Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?