R. et al v. Department of Education
Plaintiff: D. R. and E. R.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2023cv09667
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie Figueredo
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1415 IDEA: Challenge decision re education for handicapped
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Lauren Howland dated 12/1/23 re: ECF No. 6. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Howland, Lauren)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Ccnsent addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Lauren Howland dated 11/21/23., #1 Complaint. Application Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8. New York City Department of Education answer due 2/22/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 11/22/2023) (rro)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Ccnsent addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Lauren Howland dated 11/21/23. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Howland, Lauren)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Michelle Howland on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Howland, Lauren)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER In this case, Plaintiffs seek attorney's fees in connection with their claims under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act, Title 20, United States Code, Section 1410 et seq. By separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring the matter to the assigned Magistrate Judge both for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement, and for any dispositive motions, including motions for summary judgment. Unless and until the Magistrate Judge orders otherwise, the parties shall file a joint letter (addressed to the Magistrate Judge), no later than two weeks from the date of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. In addition, to conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, Plaintiffs shall, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, file on the docket a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before the undersigned. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter by the same deadline advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. There will be no adverse consequences if the parties do not consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/15/2023) (jca)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/15/2023) (jca)
November 14, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge P. Kevin Castel is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
November 7, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(gp)
November 3, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 3, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 3, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D. R.(individually), D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled son, R.R.), E. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled son, R.R.), E. R.(individually)..(Mayerson, Gary)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mayerson, Gary)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28515825)Document filed by E. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled son, R.R.), D. R.(individually), E. R.(individually), D. R.(on behalf of their minor disabled son, R.R.)..(Mayerson, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. et al v. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. R.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. R.
Represented By: Gary S Mayerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?