Kohler Co. v. Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC
Plaintiff: Kohler Co.
Defendant: Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv09686
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF KADIE M. JELENCHICK PRO HAC VICE: granting #11 Motion for Kadie M. Jelenchick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 11/27/2023) (ama)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 11/27/2023) (ama)
November 27, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC answer due 1/16/2024. (ama)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Graham D. Welch dated November 22, 2023. Document filed by Kohler Co...(Welch, Graham)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service. Document filed by Kohler Co...(Welch, Graham)
November 14, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Kadie M. Jelenchick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28562707. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Kadie M. Jelenchick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28562707. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kohler Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kadie M. Jelenchick, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Kadie M. Jelenchick (Wisconsin), #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Welch, Graham)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC served on 11/6/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. Service was accepted by Jill Rez. Document filed by Kohler Co...(Welch, Graham)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 368 647 472, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 11/8/2023) (vfr)
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(gp)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Continuation of Form AO 120).(Welch, Graham)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Welch, Graham)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC. Document filed by Kohler Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - D767,732, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - D949,293, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - D823,988, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - D613,824, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - D959,614, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - D844,752, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - D678,487, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - LF1151BR2PC, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - LF1175BR2PC, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - LF1211BR2-4PC, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - LF1240BR2-4PC, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - LF1241BR2-4PC-B, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M - LF1267BR2PC-B, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N - LFH1117BR2PC, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O - LFH1117BR2PC, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P - STWOD1099BR8PC, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q - STWOD1120BR8PC, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R - BT2092AC1-R).(Welch, Graham)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC..(jgo)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Graham Donnelly Welch to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Graham Donnelly Welch. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Graham Donnelly Welch to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Graham Donnelly Welch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kohler Co.; Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Graham Donnelly Welch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1338; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:271; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 6, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 6, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 6, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 3, 2023 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint,,. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28520845..(Welch, Graham)
November 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Graham Donnelly Welch. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint,,. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 11/8/2023..(jgo)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kohler Co...(Welch, Graham)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Signature Plumbing Specialties LLc, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kohler Co...(Welch, Graham)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Kohler Co.. Document filed by Kohler Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - D767,732, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - D949,293, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - D823,988, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - D613,824, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - D959,614, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - D844,752, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - D678,487, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Welch, Graham) Modified on 11/6/2023 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohler Co. v. Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Plumbing Specialties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kohler Co.
Represented By: Graham Donnelly Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?