Firebrand PBC v. Green Note Capital Partners SPV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Firebrand PBC
Defendant: Eddie Matut, Green Note Capital Partners SPV, LLC, KYF Global Partners, LLC, Gold Stone Funding, Inc., Eddie Gold, Freddy Kassab, Isaac Kassab, Gabriel Mann, ABC Corporations 1 Through 10 and John Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2023cv09711
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), that this matter having been amicably resolved by and between the parties be and is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs. The Order to Show Cause (Docket Entry No. 8) is hereby withdrawn as moot, without prejudice. SO ORDERED. The Court is in receipt of the Notice of Dismissal. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate this case if not already terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/9/2023) (ate)
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) ABC Corporations 1 Through 10, John Does 1 through 10, Gold Stone Funding, Inc., Green Note Capital Partners SPV, LLC, KYF Global Partners, LLC, Freddy Kassab, Isaac Kassab, Gabriel Mann, Eddie Matut. Document filed by Firebrand PBC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Vytell, Nicholas)
November 6, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINTS: ORDERED that the above-named Defendants shall show cause before this Court, at Courtroom 24A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street and State of New York, on November 17, 2023 at 11:00am or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure preliminarily enjoining and restraining Defendants, and their agents, officers, investors, trustees, employees, successors, heirs, and assigns, and any other person under their direction or control, whether acting individually or in concert with others, or through any corporate or other entity or device through which one or more of them may now or hereafter act or conduct business, as further set forth. FURTHER ORDERED, that pending the hearing and disposition of the above-referenced Order to Show Cause or further Order of this Court, Defendants are temporarily restrained from any conduct in violation of (i) or (ii) above; and it is FURTHER ORDERED, that a copy of this Order to Show Cause, along with all documents in support, shall be served on Defendants electronically by way of available email address and/or FedEx within two (2) days of receipt of the signed Order by counsel for Plaintiff; and it is FURTHER ORDERED, that opposition, if any, shall be filed on or before 11/9/2023, and shall comply with Rule 4 of the Court's Individual Rules & Practices for page limits and other requirements, and any reply shall be filed by November 13, 2023, and it is FURTHER ORDERED, that security in the amount of $1,000.00 shall be posted by Plaintiff no later than November 17, 2023. (Show Cause Hearing set for 11/17/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Replies due by 11/13/2023. Show Cause Response due by 11/9/2023.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods, Part I on 11/3/2023) (mml)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Kreutz in Support re: #4 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Firebrand PBC..(Vytell, Nicholas)
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Nicholas A. Vytell, Esq. in Support re: #4 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Firebrand PBC..(Vytell, Nicholas)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Firebrand PBC..(Vytell, Nicholas)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Firebrand PBC..(Vytell, Nicholas) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vytell, Nicholas) Modified on 11/3/2023 (jgo).
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Firebrand PBC..(Vytell, Nicholas)
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS, 1-10, the fictitious names for unknown companies and/or other business entities, GOLD STONE FUNDING, INC., GREEN NOTE CAPITAL PARTNERS SPV, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10 (names and number of whom are unknown at present), KYF GLOBAL PARTNERS, LLC, Freddy Kassab, Isaac Kassab, Gabriel Mann, Eddie Matut. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28521929)Document filed by Firebrand PBC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit B - SBA Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - CRF UCC Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Intercreditor Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Green Note MCA Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - KYF MCA Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - GN Debt Restructuring Proposal, #8 Exhibit H - KYF Debt Restructuring Proposal, #9 Exhibit I - GN Lien Notice, #10 Exhibit J - Delaware UCC Search).(Vytell, Nicholas)
November 3, 2023 Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers). Transmitted re: #8 Order to Show Cause to the Finance Unit (Cashiers) for case processing. (mml)
November 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicholas Alexander Vytell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code v (Voluntary);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted;. (jgo)
November 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicholas Alexander Vytell to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF case caption must list all of the parties. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al'; the Basis of Jurisdiction code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas Alexander Vytell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: GREEN NOTE CAPITAL PARTNERS SPV, LLC; KYF GLOBAL PARTNERS, LLC; GOLD STONE FUNDING, INC.; Eddie Matut; ABC CORPORATIONS, 1-10, the fictitious names for unknown companies and/or other business entities; JOHN DOES 1-10 (names and number of whom are unknown at present). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted; party name was modified to add party text separately. (jgo)
November 3, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 3, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 3, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firebrand PBC v. Green Note Capital Partners SPV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Matut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Note Capital Partners SPV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYF Global Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Stone Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddy Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firebrand PBC
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Vytell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?