Greenhouse v. Website Symmetry et al
Plaintiff: Albert Greenhouse
Defendant: Website Symmetry, Video Symmetry, Logo Symmetry, Blitz Design, Inc., 360 Art Studio, Inc., Evrima Chicago, LLC, Amy Connor, Seth Miles, Jason Parker, Nick Fisher and 360 Art Design, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Ghostwriting Universe
Case Number: 1:2023cv09754
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale E Ho. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 139 248 881, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E Ho on 11/7/2023) (ks)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thompson, Roger)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against 360 Art Design, Inc., Blitz Design, Inc., Amy Connor, Evrima Chicago, LLC, Nick Fisher, Ghostwriting Universe, Logo Symmetry, Seth Miles, Jason Parker, Video Symmetry, Website Symmetry. Document filed by Albert Greenhouse..(Thompson, Roger)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Website Symmetry. (vf)
November 6, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 6, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 6, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Roger S. Thompson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roger S. Thompson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 360 Art Studio, Inc., Ghostwriting Universe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Roger S. Thompson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
November 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Roger S. Thompson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf)
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thompson, Roger) Modified on 11/6/2023 (vf).
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Website Symmetry, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Albert Greenhouse..(Thompson, Roger)
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against 360 Art Studio, Inc., Blitz Design, Inc., Amy Connor, Evrima Chicago, LLC, Nick Fisher, Ghostwriting Universe, Logo Symmetry, Seth Miles, Jason Parker, Video Symmetry, Website Symmetry. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28524763)Document filed by Albert Greenhouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit E-mail, #3 Exhibit Proof of Payment, #4 Exhibit Invoice, #5 Exhibit Proof of Payment, #6 Exhibit Text, #7 Exhibit Invoice, #8 Exhibit Proof of Payment, #9 Exhibit E-mail, #10 Exhibit Proof of Payment, #11 Exhibit Proof of Payment, #12 Exhibit Proof of Payment, #13 Exhibit Text, #14 Exhibit Text, #15 Exhibit Text, #16 Exhibit Text, #17 Exhibit Text).(Thompson, Roger) Modified on 11/6/2023 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenhouse v. Website Symmetry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Greenhouse
Represented By: Roger S. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Website Symmetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Video Symmetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logo Symmetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blitz Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 Art Studio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evrima Chicago, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 Art Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Ghostwriting Universe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?