Calamari v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Paul Thomas Calamari
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2023cv09788
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: by Paul Thomas Calamari, Commissioner of Social Security. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/17/2023).(ama)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Paul Thomas Calamari..(Olinsky, Howard)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: By Order today, the Court is referring this case to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before Magistrate Judge Moses. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this Order, either mail or email to Failla_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this Order (and also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/consent-proceed-us-magistrate-judge). If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before Magistrate Judge Moses rather than before the undersigned. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before Magistrate Judge Moses, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of the date of this Order advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. There will be no adverse consequences if the parties do not consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/16/2023) (ama)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/16/2023) (ama)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heetano Shamsoondar on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Shamsoondar, Heetano)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE BRIEFING OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 22-MISC-329 Standing Order filed November 21, 2022). WHEREAS, cases filed on and after December 1, 2022 under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking judicial review on the record of final decisions by the Commissioner of Social Security ("Commissioner") denying applications for social security benefits, are governed by the simplified procedures set forth in the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions ("Supplemental Rules" or "Supp. R.");... in order to ensure the efficient disposition of cases subject to the Supplemental Rules, it is hereby ORDERED that, prior to seeking an extension of any deadline set forth in Supp. R. 4, 6, 7, or 8, the party seeking such extension shall attempt to meet and confer with the opposing party in a good faith effort to agree upon a reasonable and comprehensive schedule for all future filings in the case. If the parties reach agreement, the proposed schedule shall be presented to the Court for approval and, if approved, will govern all remaining proceedings in the case.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2022) (gp)
November 7, 2023 NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 1/8/2024..(gp)
November 7, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 7, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 7, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Olinsky, Howard)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28526631)Document filed by Paul Thomas Calamari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action).(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calamari v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Thomas Calamari
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heetano Shamsoondar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?