Federal National Mortgage Association v. BUFNY II Associates, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Asociation and Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: BUFNY II Associates, L.P., Housing Trust Fund Corporation, The City of New York, Salimata Bokum, Almamy Jammeh, Lamine Kone, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, New York City Environmental Control Board and John Does #1-100
Case Number: 1:2023cv09795
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jessica G L Clarke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joy Tolulope Anakhu on behalf of New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, The City of New York..(Anakhu, Joy)
December 22, 2023 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Joel Shaddox in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Receiver.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note, #3 Exhibit 3 - Mortgage Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mortgage and Note Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - PNL, #7 Exhibit 7 - Title Report, #8 Exhibit 8A - Municipal Reports - 102 W 137th Street, #9 Exhibit 8B - Municipal Reports - 106 W 137th Street, #10 Exhibit 8C - Municipal Reports - 110 W 137th Street, #11 Exhibit 8D - Municipal Reports - 124 W 137th Street, #12 Exhibit 8E - Municipal Reports - 176 W 137th Street, #13 Exhibit 8F - Municipal Reports - 163 W 137th Street, #14 Exhibit 8G - Municipal Reports - 531 Lenox Avenue).(Chapman, Dean)
December 22, 2023 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Orazio Crisalli in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Receiver.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association..(Chapman, Dean)
December 22, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Receiver. . Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association..(Chapman, Dean)
December 22, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Receiver. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order).(Chapman, Dean)
December 19, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Clerk's Certificate of Default (ECF No. 21). Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association..(Chapman, Dean)
December 8, 2023 Filing 21 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to (i) BUFNY II Associates, L.P., (ii) the Housing Trust Fund Corporation, (iii) the City of New York, (iv) Salimata Bokum, (v) Almamy Jammeh, (vi) Lamine Kone, (vii) the New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, and (viii) the New York City Environmental Control Board. (tp)
December 8, 2023 Filing 20 AFFIRMATION of Dean L. Chapman in Support re: #19 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Affidavit of Service).(Chapman, Dean)
December 8, 2023 Filing 19 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association..(Chapman, Dean) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 29, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Pretrial Conference, and Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Case of Jessica G.L. Clarke, United States District Judge. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association..(Chapman, Dean)
November 29, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association..(Chapman, Dean)
November 16, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. BUFNY II Associates, L.P. served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023; Salimata Bokum served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023; Housing Trust Fund Corporation served on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; Almamy Jammeh served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023; Lamine Kone served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023; New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023; New York City Environmental Control Board served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023; The City of New York served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association..(Chapman, Dean)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 14, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by Microsoft Teams. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jessica-g-l-clarke. All parties are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. The joint letter shall not exceed five pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 11/15/2023) (ama)
November 10, 2023 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Dean Lindsay Chapman, Jr. dated November 10, 2023 re: Local Civil Rule 1.6 and Rule 13 of the Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges in the Southern District of New York. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Chapman, Dean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BUFNY II Associates, L.P., Salimata Bokum, Housing Trust Fund Corporation, Almamy Jammeh, Lamine Kone, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, New York City Environmental Control Board, The City of New York..(gp)
November 7, 2023 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 7, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 7, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dean Lindsay Chapman on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 6, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BUFNY II Associates, L.P., Salimata Bokum, Housing Trust Fund Corporation, Almamy Jammeh, Lamine Kone, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, New York City Environmental Control Board, The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation..(Chapman, Dean)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chapman, Dean)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUFNY II Associates, L.P., Salimata Bokum, Housing Trust Fund Corporation, Almamy Jammeh, John Does #1-100, Lamine Kone, New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development, New York City Environmental Control Board, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28528847)Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Asociation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Chapman, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. BUFNY II Associates, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Asociation
Represented By: Dean Lindsay Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Dean Lindsay Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFNY II Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Trust Fund Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Joy Tolulope Anakhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salimata Bokum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almamy Jammeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamine Kone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Housing Preservation and Development
Represented By: Joy Tolulope Anakhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?