Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp., Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC and Alibaba.com LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv09853
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated January 4, 2024., #20 Amended Complaint. Granted. Alibaba Cloud US LLC answer due 2/4/2024; Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc. answer due 2/4/2024; Alibaba Group Holding Limited answer due 2/4/2024; Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC answer due 2/4/2024; Alibaba.com LLC answer due 2/4/2024; Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp. answer due 2/4/2024. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/5/2024) (rro)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated January 4, 2024. Document filed by Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC, Alibaba.com LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp...(Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer)
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Amended Complaint,, against Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC, Alibaba.com LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and assignment, #2 Exhibit Listing, #3 Exhibit Chart, #4 Exhibit Chart, #5 Exhibit Chart, #6 Exhibit Chart, #7 Exhibit Notice, #8 Exhibit Notice, #9 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter, filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Permission to file 2d Amended Complaint is granted, on defendant's oral advice that defendant does not oppose. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/12/2023) (rro)
December 10, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Richard Garbarini dated 12/10/2023 re: Request for a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint).(Garbarini, Richard)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated December 6, 2023., #1 Complaint. Granted. Alibaba Cloud US LLC answer due 1/5/2024; Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc. answer due 1/5/2024; Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC answer due 1/5/2024; Alibaba.com LLC answer due 1/5/2024; Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp. answer due 1/5/2024. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/7/2023) (rro)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated December 6, 2023. Document filed by Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC, Alibaba.com LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp...(Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Managing Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Alibaba Cloud US LLC served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Managing Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp. served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. Service was accepted by Laura Cah, Managing Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc. served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. Service was accepted by Amy Stofull, Managing Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Alibaba.com LLC served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. Service was accepted by Laura Giacoma, Managing Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 14, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC, Alibaba.com LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp...(jgo)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp., Alibaba.com U.S. LLC, Alibaba.com LLC, re: #7 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum).(Garbarini, Richard)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC, Alibaba.com LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp..Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Listing, #3 Exhibit Alibaba Website, #4 Exhibit Alibaba Cloud, #5 Exhibit Notice, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)
November 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all the parties as to whom the summons request is for was selected. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 10, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard)
November 10, 2023 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum).(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 11/13/2023 (sj).
November 9, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the party names whom summons is for must be listed on the docket entry text; the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the attached addendum does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption (Alibaba.com E-Commerce US Corp.). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #3 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; 'Action' or 'Appeal' must be selected on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (jgo)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum).(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 11/9/2023 (jgo).
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 11/9/2023 (jgo).
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum).(Garbarini, Richard)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alibaba Cloud US LLC, Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc., Alibaba Group Holding Limited, Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC, Alibaba.com LLC, Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28542042)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Screenshot, #3 Exhibit Alibaba Infringements, #4 Exhibit Cloud Infringements, #5 Exhibit Notice, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)
November 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/13/2023. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba Group (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba Group Holding Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba Cloud US LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba.com US E-Commerce Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba.Com U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba.com LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?