CE3 LLC v. Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CE3 LLC
Defendant: Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. and TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091
Case Number: 1:2023cv09856
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc., TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091..(Marcus, Caryn)
December 6, 2023 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chicken Soup for the Soul Productions, LLC, Corporate Parent Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, Corporate Parent Chicken Soup for the Soul Holdings, LLC for Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc., TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091. Document filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc., TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Organizational Chart, #2 Exhibit Corporate Spreadsheet).(Marcus, Caryn)
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. Service was accepted by Dawn Aquino, Office Manager. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Petrona Verala, Registered Agent. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091 served on 11/16/2023, answer due 12/7/2023. Service was accepted by Petrona Verala, Registered Agent. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 31, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules andPractices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 1/31/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/13/2023) (ama)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091..(gp)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to TOFG LLC d.b.a. 1091, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (vf)
November 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott R. Landau to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TOFG LLC d.b.a 1091, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott) Modified on 11/13/2023 (vf).
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Landau, Scott)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091..(jgo)
November 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott R. Landau to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF 'To' section does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Scott R. Landau to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Citizenship Defendant codes were selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties; the incorrect Citizenship Plaintiff code was selected; the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott R. Landau. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $638,555,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $639,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott R. Landau. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CE3 LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 9, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Landau, Scott) Modified on 11/9/2023 (jgo).
November 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Scott R. Landau. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 11/13/2023..(jgo)
November 8, 2023 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28544234..(Landau, Scott)
November 8, 2023 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00..(Landau, Scott)
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc., TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091. (Filing Fee $ 402.00.)Document filed by CE3 LLC..(Landau, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CE3 LLC v. Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Caryn L. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOFG LLC d/b/a 1091
Represented By: Caryn L. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CE3 LLC
Represented By: Scott R. Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?