Betancourt v. Bx Parking LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Betancourt
Defendant: Yantzi D. Adames, BX PARKING LLC, Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc., Yantzi Adams and Shree Deshmukh
Case Number: 1:2023cv09931
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice to Consent (No Appearance by Defendant Deshmukh) addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Colin Mulholland, Esq. dated January 5, 2024. Document filed by Bryan Betancourt..(Mulholland, Colin)
January 2, 2024 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/1/2024.(sge)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/11/2024. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yantzi D. Adames, Bx Parking LLC, Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc., Shree Deshmukh..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
December 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The parties are directed to comply with the Court's December 4, 2023 order forthwith, and in no event later than January 5, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/23/23) (yv) Modified on 12/26/2023 (yv).
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this order file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf). The executed form should be filed on ECF as a "Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge," and be described using the "Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge" filing event in accordance with ECF Rule 13.27. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. and as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/04/2023) (ama)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jason Mizrahi, esq. dated November 27, 2023., #1 Complaint. Application granted. Defendants Bx Parking LLC and Yantzi D. Adames' application for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt. No. 12, is granted. The deadline for Defendants Bx Parking LLC and Yantzi D. Adames to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 27, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 12. SO ORDERED. Yantzi D. Adames answer due 12/27/2023; Bx Parking LLC answer due 12/27/2023. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/27/2023) (tg)
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jason Mizrahi, esq. dated November 27, 2023. Document filed by Yantzi D. Adames, Bx Parking LLC, Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc...(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eunon Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Yantzi D. Adames, Bx Parking LLC, Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc...(Mizrahi, Eunon)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of Yantzi D. Adames, Bx Parking LLC, Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc...(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/9/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/13/2023) (jca)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shree Deshmukh. (sj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yantzi D. Adames. (sj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bx Parking LLC. (sj)
November 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Colin James Mulholland. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
November 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Colin James Mulholland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BX PARKING LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
November 13, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 13, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Colin James Mulholland to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name error in 'To' section of PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yantzi Adames a/k/a Yantzi Adams, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Betancourt..(Mulholland, Colin)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shree Deshmukh, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Betancourt..(Mulholland, Colin)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Betancourt.(Mulholland, Colin) Modified on 11/13/2023 (sj).
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BX Parking LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Betancourt..(Mulholland, Colin)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yantzi D. Adames, BX PARKING LLC, Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc., Shree Deshmukh. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28551281)Document filed by Bryan Betancourt..(Mulholland, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betancourt v. Bx Parking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yantzi D. Adames
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BX PARKING LLC
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtlandt Parking Systems Inc.
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yantzi Adams
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shree Deshmukh
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Betancourt
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?