Insider Inc. et al v. United States Small Business Administration
Plaintiff: Insider Inc., KATHERINE LONG and JOHN NEWSHAM
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Case Number: 1:2023cv09946
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Small Business Administration. (vf)
December 1, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Small Business Administration. (vf)
November 30, 2023 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration c/o U.S. Attorney's Office, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher)
November 30, 2023 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration c/o U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher)
November 29, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Bix Bettwy to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration c/o United States Attorney's Office, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/29/2023 (jgo).
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration c/o U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/29/2023 (jgo).
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Small Business Administration..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Bix Bettwy to RE-FILE Document No. #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; summons request could only be issued to parties of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PARTY ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney's Office, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/22/2023 (jgo).
November 21, 2023 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PARTY ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/22/2023 (jgo).
November 21, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher)
November 14, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Bix Bettwy to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant party name does not exactly match complaint caption title ( U.S. Small Business Administration ). Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney's Office, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/14/2023 (pc).
November 13, 2023 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/14/2023 (pc).
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/14/2023 (pc).
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Topic, Matthew) Modified on 11/14/2023 (pc).
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., Katherine Long, John Newsham..(Topic, Matthew) Modified on 11/14/2023 (pc).
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Bix Bettwy on behalf of Insider Inc., KATHERINE LONG, JOHN NEWSHAM..(Bettwy, Christopher)
November 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Bix Bettwy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: KATHERINE LONG, JOHN NEWSHAM. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
November 13, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 13, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 13, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Bix Bettwy to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant's name in caption must match exactly as it appears in pleading; summons are only issued to parties of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bettwy, Christopher)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney's Office, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., KATHERINE LONG, JOHN NEWSHAM..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/13/2023 (sj).
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., KATHERINE LONG, JOHN NEWSHAM..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/13/2023 (sj).
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Small Business Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider Inc., KATHERINE LONG, JOHN NEWSHAM..(Bettwy, Christopher) Modified on 11/13/2023 (sj).
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Small Business Administration. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28552770)Document filed by Insider Inc., JOHN NEWSHAM, KATHERINE LONG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L).(Bettwy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insider Inc. et al v. United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insider Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Bix Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE LONG
Represented By: Christopher Bix Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN NEWSHAM
Represented By: Christopher Bix Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?