Magee v. Merzer Realty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Betsy Magee
Defendant: Merzer Realty, LLC, Michael Merges, Jerry Troianos and Costos Merges
Case Number: 1:2023cv10061
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 9. Mailed to: Betsy Magee 374 West 46 St. #2E New York, NY 10036. (mt)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiff is able to identify a federal cause of action, she may file an amended complaint within 30 days. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/2/2024) (vfr)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #7 Order. Document filed by Betsy Magee. (sc)
December 12, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 7. Mailed to: Betsy Magee 374 West 46 St. #2E New York, NY 10036. (sha)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Therefore, the Court hereby directs Plaintiff to retain counsel within 45 days of this order. If Plaintiff fails to do so, Plaintiff's action will be dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/8/2023) (vfr)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Michael Merges served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. Service was accepted by Alexander "Doe," occupant who refused to provide last name. Document filed by Betsy Magee. sc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Merzer Realty, LLC served on 12/1/2023, answer due 12/22/2023. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky as NYDOS Process Receiving Specialist. Document filed by Betsy Magee. (sc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED.Summons and Complaint served. Jerry Troianos, served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. Service was accepted by Alexander "Doe," occupant who refused to give last name. Document filed by Betsy Magee. (sc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Costos Merges served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. Service was accepted by Alexander "Doe," occupant who refused to give last name. Document filed by Betsy Magee. (sc)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Costos Merges, Michael Merges, Merzer Realty, LLC, Jerry Troianos. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 23192)Document filed by Betsy Magee..(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2023: #1 Receipt) (rdz).
November 15, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
November 15, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)
November 15, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Costos Merges, Michael Merges, Merzer Realty, LLC, Jerry Troianos..(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magee v. Merzer Realty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merzer Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Merges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Troianos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costos Merges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?