Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Focus Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Focus Technology Co., Ltd., Crov Inc. and inQbrands Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10078
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jason Xu dated January 11, 2024 re: Letter Requesting Discovery Deadline Extension. Document filed by Focus Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Case Management Plan).(Xu, Jason)
December 15, 2023 Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #11 Amended Complaint, against Crov Inc., Focus Technology Co., Ltd., inQbrands Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Related document: #11 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for all parties to this matter that: Defendant FOCUS TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. executed a waiver of service on December 8, 2023, which makes its time to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint on or before March 7, 2024. Defendants CROY and INQBRANDS time to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint shall be extended to be on or before March 7, 2024 to align with the response date of Defendant FOCUS TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. SO ORDERED. (Crov Inc. answer due 3/7/2024; inQbrands Inc. answer due 3/7/2024.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/15/23) (yv)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Focus Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 3/7/2024. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby, ORDERED as follows: Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record (or where a party is not yet represented, such party) and, if necessary, provide them with a copy of this order. Except as noted in Paragraph 5 below, counsel for all parties are directed to confer, complete and sign the attached "Civil Case Management Plan" and to fax it to the Court within thirty (30) days. The parties are free to set their own deadlines as long as the plan provides for the completion of all discovery within six months of this order and the filing of a proposed "joint final-pretrial order," within forty-five days of the close of discovery. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must appear at a conference on 2/1/2024 at 10:30 a.m., in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. ( Initial Conference set for 2/1/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/12/23) (yv)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Focus Technology Co., Ltd. served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. Service was accepted by Crystal Yuan, Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Crov Inc. served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. Service was accepted by Aliison Rathmanner, Managing Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Crov Inc., Focus Technology Co., Ltd., inQbrands Inc..Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to inQbrands Inc...(jgo)
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Focus Technology Co., Ltd...(jgo)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crov Inc...(jgo)
November 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 16, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 16, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to inQbrands Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Crov Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Focus Technology Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crov Inc., Focus Technology Co., Ltd., inQbrands Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28576463)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Focus Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crov Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: inQbrands Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?