Ellison v. United States of America
Petitioner: Anthony Ellison
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv10080
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Anthony Ellison Reg. 86282-054 at Metropolitan Detention Center P.O. Box 329002 Brooklyn, NY 11232, on 11/27/2023 Re: #3 Order to Answer. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge.(sha)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2255 The Court, having concluded that the motion brought under 28 U.S.C. 2255 should not be summarily dismissed as being without merit, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Criminal Division of the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York that this order has been issued. The U.S. Attorney's Office is directed to file an answer or other pleadings in response to the motion by January 16, 2023. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date on which Movant is served with Respondent's answer to file a response. Absent further order, the motion will be considered fully submitted as of that date. All further papers filed or submitted for filing must include the criminal docket number and will be docketed in the criminal case. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to petitioner. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/17/2023) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28 U.S.C. 2255). NO FURTHER ENTRIES. PLEASE SEE CRIMINAL CASE: 1:18-cr-00834-PAE-9. Document filed by Anthony Ellison. (sac)
November 15, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)
November 15, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?