Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Onramp Bitcoin LLC
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Onramp Bitcoin LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv10121
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Richard Garbarini. RE-FILE Document No. #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the notice of dismissal is pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Onramp Bitcoin LLC. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 1/11/2024 (tp).
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Set Aside Default re #15 MOTION to Set Aside Default . filed by Onramp Bitcoin LLC. Defendant's motion to set aside default judgment (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 23, 2024. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 1/2/2024) (ate)
January 2, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Onramp Bitcoin LLC answer due 1/23/2024. (ate)
December 29, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of of Consent/Non-Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Set Aside Default .. Document filed by Onramp Bitcoin LLC..(Heitner, Darren)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Document filed by Onramp Bitcoin LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jesse Myers).(Heitner, Darren)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Onramp Bitcoin, LLC. (tp)
December 16, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Richard Garbarini dated 12/16/2023 re: Defendant's Default. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 16, 2023 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Richard Garbarini in Support re: #10 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Complaint with Exhibits).(Garbarini, Richard)
December 16, 2023 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 16, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Defendant had until December 12, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. See ECF No. 8. That date has passed without Defendant answering or otherwise responding to the complaint, and without any communication by the parties with the Court. Plaintiff shall submit a letter by December 19, 2023, advising the Court of next steps. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Onramp Bitcoin LLC served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. Service was accepted by Allison Rathmanner, Managing Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/21/2023) (jca)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Onramp Bitcoin LLC. (vf)
November 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (vf)
November 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf)
November 20, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 20, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 20, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Onramp Bitcoin LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 11/20/2023 (vf).
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Onramp Bitcoin LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28584692)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice, #3 Exhibit Notice, #4 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Onramp Bitcoin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onramp Bitcoin LLC
Represented By: Darren Heitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?