Sancton v. OpenAI Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julian Sancton, Rich Cohen, James Shapiro, Eugene Linden, Taylor Branch, Daniel Okrent, Simon Winchester, Jia Tolentino, Jonathan Alter, Stacy Schiff, Kai Bird and Sides Hampton
Defendant: OpenAI Inc., OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC and Microsoft Corporation
Interested Party: Authors Guild, David Baldacci, Mary Bly, Michael Connelly, Sylvia Day, Jonathan Franzen, John Grisham, Elin Hilderbrand, Christina Baker Kline, Maya Shanbhag Lang, Victor LaValle, George R.R. Martin, Jodi Picoult, Douglas Preston, Roxana Robinson, George Saunders, Scott Turow and Rachel Vail
Case Number: 1:2023cv10211
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Alejandra Christina Salinas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Rohit Dwarka Nath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Justin Adatto Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
November 30, 2023 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-08292-SHS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
November 30, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
November 30, 2023 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 18 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jca)
November 30, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (tro)
November 27, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Alejandra Christina Salinas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28615667. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Julian Sancton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - TX, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Salinas, Alejandra)
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Justin Adatto Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Julian Sancton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Nelson, Justin)
November 27, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Justin Adatto Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #17 MOTION for Alejandra Christina Salinas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28615667. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 27, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Justin A. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28609199. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
November 27, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Rohit Dwarka Nath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28609166. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Justin A. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28609199. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Julian Sancton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - TX, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 11/27/2023 (vba).
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Rohit Dwarka Nath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28609166. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Julian Sancton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #3 Supplement Letter of Good Standing - AZ, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Nath, Rohit)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Attorneys' list).(Smyser, Craig)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI, LLC..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI OpCo LLC..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Microsoft Corporation..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Craig Smyser to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 22, 2023 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Sidney H. Stein as possibly related to 23-cv-8292. (jgo)
November 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Craig Smyser. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Julian Sancton. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Microsoft Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Julian Sancton..(Smyser, Craig)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OpenAI LLC and OAI Corporation, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Julian Sancton..(Smyser, Craig)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Opco LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Julian Sancton..(Smyser, Craig)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Smyser, Craig)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Smyser on behalf of Julian Sancton..(Smyser, Craig)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:23-cv-08292. Document filed by Julian Sancton..(Smyser, Craig)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorneys' list).(Smyser, Craig) Modified on 11/22/2023 (jgo).
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28597768)Document filed by Julian Sancton..(Smyser, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sancton v. OpenAI Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Sancton
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Represented By: Justin Nelson
Represented By: Rohit Nath
Represented By: Alejandra Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Cohen
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shapiro
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Linden
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Branch
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Okrent
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Winchester
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jia Tolentino
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Alter
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Schiff
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai Bird
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sides Hampton
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI GP, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI OpCo LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Global LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAI Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Annette Louise Hurst
Represented By: Christopher Cariello
Represented By: Marc Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Authors Guild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David Baldacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mary Bly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sylvia Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jonathan Franzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Elin Hilderbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Christina Baker Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Maya Shanbhag Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Victor LaValle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: George R.R. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jodi Picoult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Douglas Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Roxana Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: George Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott Turow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rachel Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?