Securities and Exchange Commission v. Brite Advisors USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Brite Advisors USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10212
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pre-trial conference in this matter is adjourned to February 21, 2024, at 4:20 P.M. The parties shall jointly file the materials described in the Order at Dkt. 4 by February 14, 2024. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 29, 2024. Initial Conference set for 2/21/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/11/2024) (mml)
January 11, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brite Advisors USA, Inc. answer due 2/29/2024. (mml)
January 10, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Travis Hill dated January 10, 2024. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Hill, Travis)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brite Advisors USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Hill, Travis)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Order, Judge's Model Civil Case Management Plan, Judge's Individual Rules served on Brite Advisors USA, Inc. on November 28, 2023. Service was accepted by Natalie Napierala, attorney for the defendant. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Hill, Travis)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint, Waiver of Service of Process Form, ECF Rules, Judge's Individual Rules served on Brite Advisors USA, Inc. on November 27, 2023. Service was accepted by Natalie Napierala, attorney for defendant. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Hill, Travis)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/27/2023) (jca)
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Travis Hill on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Hill, Travis)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Apps, Antonia)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brite Advisors USA, Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Apps, Antonia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Brite Advisors USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Antonia Marie Apps
Represented By: Travis Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brite Advisors USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?