Vila v. We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Vila
Defendant: We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC, We Evolvetogether LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv10219
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Does 1-10, We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC, We Evolvetogether LLC. Document filed by Carlos Vila. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Burroughs, Scott)
January 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Scott Burroughs. RE-FILE Document No. #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the wrong filer/filers was/were selected for the voluntary dismissal; (2) the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Does 1-10. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Burroughs, Scott) Modified on 1/17/2024 (tp).
January 13, 2024 Filing 13 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 1/13/2024 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ama)
January 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within forty-five days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within forty-five days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same forty-five day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/13/2024) (ama)
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Carlos Vila..(Burroughs, Scott)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC served on 12/1/2023, answer due 12/22/2023. Service was accepted by We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC c/o Amy Lesch (Authorized Agent in the office of the Secretary of the State, State of New York). Document filed by Carlos Vila..(Burroughs, Scott)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. We Evolvetogether LLC served on 12/1/2023, answer due 12/22/2023. Service was accepted by We Evolvetogether LLC c/o Amy Lesch (Authorized Agent in the office of the Secretary of the State, State of New York). Document filed by Carlos Vila..(Burroughs, Scott)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, January 22, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/05/2023) (ama)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC, We Evolvetogether LLC..(pc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
November 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 22, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Jenkins. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Carlos Vila, We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC, We Evolvetogether LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC; We Evolvetogether LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carlos Vila..(Jenkins, David)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Jenkins, David)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carlos Vila..(Jenkins, David)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jenkins, David)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC, We Evolvetogether LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28599293)Document filed by Carlos Vila..(Jenkins, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vila v. We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Vila
Represented By: David Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Evolvetogether Holding Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Evolvetogether LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?