Doe v. Zeumer
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Thomas Zeumer
Case Number: 1:2023cv10226
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 2/14/2024. Service due by 2/20/2024. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/10/2024) (vfr)
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Melissa Clark dated 1/9/2024. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Clark, Melissa)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Christine Michelle Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ks)
December 27, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 FIRST MOTION for Christine Michelle Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28740128. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
December 26, 2023 Filing 14 FIRST MOTION for Christine Michelle Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28740128. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christine M. Adams in Support of Her Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Adams, Christine)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 1/15/2024. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/13/2023) (jca)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Melissa Clark dated 12/12/2023. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Clark, Melissa)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Elizabeth Anne Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ks)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Accordingly, by December 15, 2023, Plaintiff shall file an application to proceed under pseudonym. Plaintiff is directed to immediately send a copy of this order to all parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/5/2023) (jca)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by January 22, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/5/2023) (jca)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by January 22, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. As further set forth by this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/5/2023) (tg)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/5/2023) (tg)
December 5, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/15/2023. (jca)
December 4, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Elizabeth Anne Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28640064. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Elizabeth Anne Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28640064. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Fegan, Elizabeth)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Zeumer..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Zeumer, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Clark, Melissa)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Clark, Melissa)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Melissa)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Zeumer. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28600136)Document filed by Jane Doe..(Clark, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Zeumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Represented By: Christine Michelle Adams
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Zeumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?