Page v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cassandra Alesia Page
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2023cv10233
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer E Willis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Rev. of Final Dec. of Sec. of HEW re: S.S. Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: by Commissioner of Social Security, Cassandra Alesia Page. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/29/2023).(ama)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Commissioner of Social Security..(King, Jonathan)
November 28, 2023 NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 1/29/2024..(jgo)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The above-referenced social security action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Willis for Report and Recommendation. This Order supersedes all prior scheduling orders in this matter. All motions and applications, including those related to scheduling, and all motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, must be made to Judge Willis and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-e-willis. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 11/27/2023) (tg)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . filed by Cassandra Alesia Page. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 11/27/2023) (tg)
November 25, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan King on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(King, Jonathan)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/22/2023) (jca)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE BRIEFING OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 22-MISC-329 Standing Order filed November 21, 2022). WHEREAS, cases filed on and after December 1, 2022 under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking judicial review on the record of final decisions by the Commissioner of Social Security ("Commissioner") denying applications for social security benefits, are governed by the simplified procedures set forth in the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions ("Supplemental Rules" or "Supp. R.");... in order to ensure the efficient disposition of cases subject to the Supplemental Rules, it is hereby ORDERED that, prior to seeking an extension of any deadline set forth in Supp. R. 4, 6, 7, or 8, the party seeking such extension shall attempt to meet and confer with the opposing party in a good faith effort to agree upon a reasonable and comprehensive schedule for all future filings in the case. If the parties reach agreement, the proposed schedule shall be presented to the Court for approval and, if approved, will govern all remaining proceedings in the case.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on November 18, 2022) (vf)
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Document filed by Cassandra Alesia Page..(Osborn, Daniel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osborn, Daniel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Cassandra Alesia Page..(Osborn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Alesia Page
Represented By: Daniel Adam Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jonathan King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?