Red Apple Media, Inc. v. Batchelor et al
Plaintiff: Red Apple Media, Inc.
Defendant: John Batchelor, Union River Press, Inc., Audioboom Limited, The Weiss Agency Inc. and Nicholas G. Malone
Case Number: 1:2023cv10253
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Batchelor, The Weiss Agency Inc., Union River Press, Inc...(Rao, Siddartha)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by John Batchelor, The Weiss Agency Inc., Union River Press, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2024 Return Date set for 2/15/2024 at 03:00 PM..(Rao, Siddartha)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #17 Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Batchelor, The Weiss Agency Inc., Union River Press, Inc. (Rao, Siddartha) Modified on 1/10/2024 (db). As per ECF-ERROR Email Correspondence received on 1/10/2024 @ 5:19pm.
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #16 Motion) - MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by John Batchelor, The Weiss Agency Inc., Union River Press, Inc. Responses due by 1/29/2024 Return Date set for 2/20/2024 at 03:00 PM. (Rao, Siddartha) Modified on 1/10/2024 (db). As per ECF-ERROR Email Correspondence received on 1/10/2024 @ 5:19pm.
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Audioboom Limited..(Dickstein, Tal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Audioboom Limited. Responses due by 1/29/2024 Return Date set for 2/15/2024 at 03:00 PM..(Dickstein, Tal)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN:This Court requires that this case shall be ready for trial on5/18/2024. The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 1/12/2024. Deposition due by 3/22/2024. Discovery due by 3/22/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 5/18/2024. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/15/2023) (rro)
December 15, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2023, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, in courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York City, New York..). (Kotowski, Linda)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Gaines on behalf of Red Apple Media, Inc...(Gaines, Emily)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Clara Haigh on behalf of Red Apple Media, Inc...(Haigh, Emily) Modified on 12/13/2023 (lb).
December 8, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Oral Argument set for 2/15/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B.). (Kotowski, Linda)
December 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/7/2023, without transcription or recording. Counsel for all parties was present. The following briefing schedule is set for the motion to dismiss: defendants opening papers are due Monday, January 8, 2024; plaintiffs answering papers are due Monday, January 29, 2024; and defendants reply papers are due Monday, February 5, 2024. Oral argument will be held on Tuesday, February 20, 2024 at 3 P.M.(Oral Argument set for 2/20/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York City, New York. Initial Pretrial Telephonic Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The public may access this proceeding by dialing :USA toll free 888-363-4735, international caller paid 215-446-3657, Access code 1086415). (Kotowski, Linda)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Audioboom Group Plc for Audioboom Limited. Document filed by Audioboom Limited..(Dickstein, Tal)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miguel Angel Lopez on behalf of Red Apple Media, Inc...(Lopez, Miguel)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 12/18/2023, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 12/18/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/29/2023) (ate)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn Matthew Clark on behalf of Red Apple Media, Inc...(Clark, Shawn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Loh on behalf of Audioboom Limited..(Loh, Alexander)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tal Efriam Dickstein on behalf of Audioboom Limited..(Dickstein, Tal)
November 27, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Paul A. Engelmayer is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rao, Siddartha)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 655172/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28603079).Document filed by John Batchelor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Action - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Action - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Action - State Court Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Second Action - State Court Affidavits of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Second Action - Stipulation).(Rao, Siddartha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Apple Media, Inc. v. Batchelor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Apple Media, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Gaines
Represented By: Miguel Angel Lopez
Represented By: Shawn Matthew Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Batchelor
Represented By: Siddartha Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union River Press, Inc.
Represented By: Siddartha Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audioboom Limited
Represented By: Tal Efriam Dickstein
Represented By: Alexander Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weiss Agency Inc.
Represented By: Siddartha Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas G. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?