Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv10256
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 in Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Letter Motion to Continue. Application granted. The conference currently set for January 16 is hereby adjourned to February 29, 2024, at 10:30 AM. No further extensions. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Dkt. 58. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/29/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 1/11/2024) (vfr)
January 9, 2024 Filing 58 SECOND LETTER MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Ryan O. Luminais dated 01/09/2024. Document filed by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC..(Luminais, Ryan)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #54 Motion for Greg K. Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 1/5/2024) (vfr)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #55 Motion for Kiley A. Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in theabove captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 1/5/2024) (vfr)
January 5, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #55 MOTION for Kiley Anne Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28770380. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
January 4, 2024 Filing 55 MOTION for Kiley Anne Aycock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-28770380. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of the Supreme Court of Texas, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Aycock, Kiley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 54 MOTION for Greg Keith Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28766591. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MT Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of the Supreme Court of Texas, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Winslett, Greg)
January 4, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #54 MOTION for Greg Keith Winslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28766591. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RYAN O. LUMINAIS granting #52 Motion for Ryan O. Luminais to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 12/8/2023) (vfr)
December 7, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Ryan O. Luminais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
December 6, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION for Ryan O. Luminais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion For Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit of Ryan Luminais, #3 Exhibit LASC Certificate of Good Standing).(Luminais, Ryan)
December 4, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #49 MOTION for Ryan O. Luminais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28637013. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Louisiana. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
December 1, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jesse Furman on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Furman, Andrew)
December 1, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Kraus on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Kraus, Matthew)
December 1, 2023 Filing 49 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ryan O. Luminais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28637013. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion For Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit of Ryan Luminais, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Luminais, Ryan) Modified on 12/4/2023 (va).
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from James M. Garner dated 11/29/2023 re: We request that the Pretrial Conference be set sometime in January 2024 to allow the parties sufficient time to prepare the necessary motions to enroll counsel. ENDORSEMENT: The request for an adjournment is granted. The conference currently set for December 8, 2023, is hereby adjourned to January 16, 2024, at 11 AM. The dial-in information remains the same. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 11/30/2023) (vfr)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 475 569 001, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 11/27/2023) (vfr)
November 22, 2023 Filing 46 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-02816. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
November 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
November 22, 2023 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AND REASONS: For the reasons set forth herein, IT IS ORDERED that Mt. Hawley's Motion, R. Doc. #10 , is GRANTED and this matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/06/2023.(js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Withdraw. Defendant's #39 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint shall be withdrawn from the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 11/1/2023. (rt) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 43 Amended Opposition by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint (Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 11/1/2023 (js). Modified on 11/1/2023 (js). Modified on 11/1/2023 (lb). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 42 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #39 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. (lb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/26/2023. (lb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 39 **WITHDRAWN PER #44 ORDER** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. (lb) Modified text on 11/2/2023 (rt). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #33 Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to Late File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/26/2023. (lb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 37 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #35 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Response to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Documents submitted as legal sized documents. Local Rule 10.1E: All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Continue the Submission Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that the submission deadline for Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint (R. Doc. #18 ) is CONTINUED until November 8, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/18/2023.(lb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 35 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Response to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Luminais, Ryan) (Main Document 35 replaced on 10/19/2023) (cs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/19/2023) (cs). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/19/2023) (cs). Modified images/text on 10/19/2023 (cs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 34 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. (1) Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. (2) Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 12, 2023 Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order)(Meaders, Julie) Modified on referral 10/13/2023 (rt). Modified text/submission date on 10/13/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying #28 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/11/2023. (lb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 10/10/2023. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jerry Pursell)(Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 10/10/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 9, 2023 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue Submission Deadline for Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meaders, Julie) Modified text/referral on 10/10/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 9, 2023 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Deadline for Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Meaders, Julie) Modified text/referral on 10/10/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney is GRANTED and that Stephanie T. Wartelle (Bar Roll #40095) to be withdrawn as counsel for Canal in the instant matter, and that Martha Y. Curtis (Bar Roll #20446) be substituted as counsel of record for Canal. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/25/2023. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #22 Motion to Reset Submission Date is GRANTED, thereby resetting the submission date on Mt. Hawley's Motion to Transfer Venue (R. Doc. #10 ) from September 27, 2023 to October 11, 2023. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/11/2023. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/25/2023.(js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 Motion to Transfer Case. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Continue. Clerk took corrective action. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Martha Y. Curtis to be substituted in place of Stephanie T. Wartelle by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luminais, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 22, 2023 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission date on #10 Motion to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meaders, Julie) Modified text/event on 9/25/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. (1) Motion, memo, proposed Pleading, and Notice of Submission submitted on legal sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E: All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. (2) Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (3) Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (4) Exhibit sticker should not be placed on Proposed Pleading. No further action necessary. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. Document submitted on legal sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E: All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICERequest for oral argument has been filed (R. Doc. 17) by plaintiff, in conjunction with a MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by defendant, Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, (R. Doc. 10), and is scheduled for submission. Notwithstanding Local Rule 78.1, this Court will issue an order setting oral argument for a specific date and time if the Court grants the requests. Counsel should not appear for oral argument until ordered to do so. THIS NOTICE DOES NOT APPLY TO PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Issued by Clerk for the Court.. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.(dp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Notice of Submission)(Luminais, Ryan) (Main Document 18 replaced on 9/20/2023) (js). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/20/2023) (js). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/20/2023) (js). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/20/2023) (js). Modified text/referral on 9/20/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 17 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC regarding #10 MOTION to Transfer Case (Luminais, Ryan) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/20/2023) (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Luminais, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 15 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Martha Y. Curtis to be substituted in place of Stephanie T. Wartelle by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luminais, Ryan) Modified on 9/20/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #13 MOTION to Withdraw Document is GRANTED, and that Doc. #7 be withdrawn from the record. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/22/2023. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 8/21/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED, thereby resetting the submission date on Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company's Motion to Transfer Venue (R. Doc. #10 ) from August 30, 2023 to September 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/21/2023.(js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case by Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luminais, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 7, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/07/2023. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 8/7/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 3, 2023 Filing 7 **WITHDRAWN BY ORDER AT R. DOC. #14 ** MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Meaders, Julie) Modified on 8/22/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 3, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and Affirmative Defenses Subject to Motion to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance: List of Parties and Pleadings by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent RLI Corp. for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Meaders, Julie) Modified text/corp parents on 7/28/2023 (js). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2023-05946 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10049993) filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders added to party Mt. Hawley Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal at Camp Apartments, LLC
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Martha Y. Curtis
Represented By: Ryan O'Neil Luminais
Represented By: Stephanie T Wartelle
Represented By: Ryan Luminais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Julie Schwartzwald Meaders
Represented By: Greg K Winslett
Represented By: Andrew Jesse Furman
Represented By: Kiley Anne Aycock
Represented By: Matthew David Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?