Sr Hospitality, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Plaintiff: SR Hospitality, LLC
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 1:2023cv10258
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 in Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jesse Furman on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Furman, Andrew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Kraus on behalf of MT Hawley Insurance Company..(Kraus, Matthew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number: 2:23-cv-04114. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
November 22, 2023 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
November 22, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
November 22, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
November 22, 2023 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that Mt. Hawley's #16 motion to transfer venue is GRANTED, and this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/9/2023.(clc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue. Due to the recent reallotment of this matter, the pending #16 motion to transfer venue will be submitted for 11/16/2023, the next valid submission date for Section M. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe.(clc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Barry W Ashe. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/31/2023.(mmv) (NEF: Sect. M, Case Mgr) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Answer to Complaint. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should thedocument you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.** (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A Certified Policy, #5 Exhibit B SR Hospitality, #6 Exhibit C In re Mt. Hawley, #7 Exhibit D Starlight, #8 Exhibit E Burk Holding, #9 Exhibit F Brooks & Brooks, #10 Exhibit G William B. Coleman, #11 Exhibit H UMMIID, #12 Exhibit I Storm Damage Sols, #13 Exhibit J Summerwind West, #14 Exhibit K La Porte Hospitality, #15 Exhibit L Recovery Performance, #16 Exhibit M Murray Hill, #17 Exhibit N Nusi Amusam, #18 Exhibit O New Hope)(Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 10/31/2023 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Filing 15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Meaders, Julie) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Filing 14 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company re #13 Answer to Complaint Diversity Jurisdiction. (Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 10/31/2023 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders added to party Mt. Hawley Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Meaders, Julie) Modified text/added linkage on 10/31/2023 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
October 6, 2023 Filing 12 Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Filing 11 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Filing 10 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 7, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sr Hospitality, LLC served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. (Robert, Austin) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/8/2023) (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 *DEFICIENT* SUMMONS Returned Executed; Mt. Hawley Insurance Company served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023. (Robert, Austin) Modified on 9/7/2023 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 1, 2023 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sr Hospitality, LLC (Robert, Austin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 1, 2023 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company filed by Sr Hospitality, LLC.(Robert, Austin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff, SR Hospitality, LLC, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) and to file a comprehensive amended complaint, without further leave of Court, properly setting forth the citizenship particulars of all of the parties, as required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). The comprehensive amended pleading shall include all of SR Hospitality's numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, which will become the operative complaint in this matter without reference to any other document in the record. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/29/2023.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (sek) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sr Hospitality LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10106443) filed by Sr Hospitality LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Austin Taylor Robert added to party Sr Hospitality LLC (pty:pla). (Robert, Austin) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/25/2023) (mmv). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/25/2023) (mmv). Modified text on 8/25/2023 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sr Hospitality, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SR Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Austin Taylor Robert
Represented By: Skye Sturlese Fantaci
Represented By: Kevin R. Sloan
Represented By: Lewis Scott Joanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Julie Schwartzwald Meaders
Represented By: Andrew Jesse Furman
Represented By: Matthew David Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?