Shihab v. Office Magazine LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jamil Gulmann Shihab
Defendant: Office Magazine LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv10294
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court whether it intends to move for default judgment, or if it has received any communication from Defendant or Defendant's counsel regarding a response to the complaint. If Plaintiff fails by February 6, 2024 to either (1) file a letter concerning the status of the case, or (2) move for default judgment against Defendant, the action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order by mail on Defendant. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 2/6/2024.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/16/24) (yv)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Office Magazine LLC served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Service was accepted by Office Magazine LLC c/o Nancy Dougherty (Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of the State, State of New York). Document filed by Jamil Gulmann Shihab..(Burroughs, Scott)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office Magazine LLC..(pc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
November 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Jenkins. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Does 1-10, Office Magazine LLC, Jamil Gulmann Shihab. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 27, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 27, 2023 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 27, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office Magazine LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jamil Gulmann Shihab..(Jenkins, David)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Jenkins, David)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jamil Gulmann Shihab..(Jenkins, David)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jenkins, David)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Office Magazine LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28608157)Document filed by Jamil Gulmann Shihab..(Jenkins, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shihab v. Office Magazine LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil Gulmann Shihab
Represented By: David Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Magazine LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?