China United Lines, LTD v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Plaintiff: China United Lines, LTD
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv10313
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Amazon.com Services LLC.Document filed by China United Lines, LTD. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Tsui-Yip, Gloria)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Amazon.com Services LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. Document filed by China United Lines, LTD..(Tsui-Yip, Gloria)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Benjamin A. Rubinstein dated December 20, 2023 re: service of process on Amazon.com Services LLC. Document filed by Amazon.com Services LLC..(Rubinstein, Benjamin)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, February 21, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 2/21/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/05/2023) (ama)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Complaint brings two breach of contract claims and subject matter jurisdiction is premised solely on diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Compl't Paragraph 3, 25- 33.) It alleges that plaintiff is organized in China with a principal place of business in China. (Compl't Paragraph 1.) It alleges upon information and belief that the defendant LLC is "organized and existing under the laws of the State of Delaware," with a Delaware business address. (Compl't Paragraph 2.) The Complaint does not allege the citizenship of any member of the defendant LLC. Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, plaintiff China United Lines, Ltd. may serve a single interrogatory upon defendant Amazon.com Services LLC as to the citizenship of all natural persons who are its members, and, if any corporation is a member, the jurisdiction under whose laws it is incorporated and the principal place of business; Amazon.com Services LLC shall serve its response to the interrogatory within fourteen (14) days. Within forty-five (45) days of this Order, China United Lines, Ltd. shall amend its complaint to correct the jurisdictional deficiencies and omissions. If, by this date, China United Lines, Ltd. either fails to amend or is unable to amend to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the action will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/29/2023) (tg)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com Services LLC..(pc)
November 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gloria Tsui-Yip. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: China United Lines, LTD, Amazon.com Services LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gloria Tsui-Yip. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
November 27, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 27, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 27, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Burke Monahan on behalf of China United Lines, LTD..(Monahan, Patrick)
November 24, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com Services LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by China United Lines, LTD..(Tsui-Yip, Gloria)
November 24, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Guangdong Port Logistics Co.,Ltd, Corporate Parent Guangzhou Port Co Ltd for China United Lines, LTD. Document filed by China United Lines, LTD..(Tsui-Yip, Gloria)
November 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tsui-Yip, Gloria)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28609923)Document filed by China United Lines, LTD..(Tsui-Yip, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: China United Lines, LTD v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: China United Lines, LTD
Represented By: Patrick Burke Monahan
Represented By: Gloria Tsui-Yip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?